American Automotive Solutions, Inc. v. Agruss Law Firm et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney W Sippel |
Case #: | 4:20-cv-01114 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:1030 Computer Fraud and Abuse Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 16, 2021 4:00 AM CST |
Defendant
Ryker Gillespie
|
|
Defendant
Cameron Lobban
|
|
Defendant
Donald Marchant
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 1
|
|
Defendant
John Does 3-50
|
|
Plaintiff
American Automotive Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Discord, Inc.
Terminated: 10/13/2020
|
|
Defendant
Icehook Systems, LLC
Terminated: 11/09/2020
|
|
Defendant
Tucows
Terminated: 11/16/2020
|
|
Defendant
Agruss Law Firm, LLC
Terminated: 09/16/2020
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cloudflare, Inc.
Terminated: 09/08/2020
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 2
Terminated: 11/30/2020
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 16, 2021 | ||
54 | 54
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 04/16 12:42 PM
ORDER re53 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Donald Marchant by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. (Kass, Jeffrey); It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 04/16/2021. Donald Marchant (a resident of South Carolina) terminated.(ANP) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
53 | 53
motion
Dismiss Party
Wed 04/14 3:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Donald Marchant by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. (Kass, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
52 | 52
2
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Tue 04/13 4:01 PM
ORDER : Plaintiffs motion, ECF No.50 , is GRANTED. The Rule 16 conferencescheduled for April 16, 2021 is vacated. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/13/21. (ARL) |
|
51 | 51
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 04/13 3:58 PM
ORDER : Plaintiffs motion to dismiss without prejudice its claims against Defendants Cameron Lobban, Ryker Gillespie, and John Doe 1, d/b/a Scammer.Info, ECF No.49 , is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/13/21. (ARL) |
|
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
50 | 50
motion
Extension
Fri 04/09 7:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to File Proposed Scheduling Plan by Plaintiff American Automotive Solutions, Inc.. (Kass, Jeffrey) |
|
49 | 49
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 04/09 7:42 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Automotive Solutions, Inc. (Kass, Jeffrey) |