California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:20-cv-07667
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 24, 2020
Terminated:Sep 14, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Feb 20, 2021 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
Allied World Assurance (U.S.) Inc
Defendant
Amerifreight, Inc.
Represented By
Scott Wing
Leahy Eisenberg And Frankel Ltd.
contact info
David H Canter
Harrington Foxx Dubrow And Canter LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cosco Fire Protection, Inc.
Represented By
Mikhail Mdinaradze
Selman Breitman LLP
contact info
Defendant
UNIS, LLC
Represented By
Scott Wing
Leahy Eisenberg And Frankel Ltd.
contact info
David H Canter
Harrington Foxx Dubrow And Canter LLP
contact info
Defendant
HDI Global Ins. Co.
Defendant
Fisch Properties, LP
421 Beverly Dr. Fifth Floor
Beverly Hills, CA 90212
Represented By
Lauren Marie Korbatov
Israel Friedberg And Korbatov LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PICC Property and Casualty Company Limited
Represented By
Thao T. Nguyen
Plews Shadley Racher Braun LLP
contact info
Hong Lu
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Kyle D. Smith
Plews Shadley Racher And Braun LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mattel Sales Corp.
Terminated: 12/04/2020
Represented By
Kevin H Scott
Halpern May Ybarra Gelberg LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
68 68 stip Dismiss Case Tue 09/14 11:27 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff PICC Property and Casualty Company Limited.(Lu, Hong)
Related: [-]