New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:20-cv-06870
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331vc Fed. Question: Violation of Constitutional Rights
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2020
Terminated:Oct 16, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Feb 21, 2021 4:52 AM EST
Defendant
Vincent G. Bradley
Represented By
Matthew Lawrence Conrad
contact info
Plaintiff
49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info
Plaintiff
Capitol Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info
Plaintiff
Columbus Ale House, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info
Plaintiff
Infinity on Main, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info
Plaintiff
Jayarvee, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info
Plaintiff
Jukimoo, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info
Plaintiff
New York Independent Venue Association
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info
Plaintiff
Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info
Plaintiff
Turks Group, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info
Plaintiff
Upstate Shows, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info

Docket last updated: 09/29/2023 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 18, 2021
40 40 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/18 11:25 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties herein, as follows: 1. This action is hereby voluntarily dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) without payments, attorneys fees, costs, disbursements, or expenses to any party; and 2. This stipulation may be executed in counterparts, all of which taken together shall constitute one stipulation, and may be executed by facsimile or electronically-transmitted signature. The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this action under F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/18/2021) (rro)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 16, 2021
39 39 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Sat 10/16 7:20 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Vincent G. Bradley and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Jukimoo, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Columbus Ale House, Inc., Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., New York Independent Venue Association, 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
order Order Mon 10/04 10:40 AM
ORDER. This case remains stayed pending the resolution of the proceedings currently before the Western District of New York in Hund v. Bradley et al., No. 20-cv-1176 (W.D.N.Y). The parties are directed to file a joint status letter as soon as that proceeding is resolved, or by December 1, 2021, whichever date is earlier. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
34 34 misc Letter Tue 06/01 11:52 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jonathan Corbett dated 06/01/2021 re: Conference Time. Document filed by New York Independent Venue Association..(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 06/01 12:00 PM
ORDER. At the parties' request, the conference scheduled for June 1, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. is adjourned to June 1, 2021 at 12:30 p.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 06/01 2:05 PM
ORDER. As stated on the record during the June 1, 2021 teleconference, the parties are directed to promptly notify the Court following any developments in the other federal case challenging the SLA guidance at issue in this case, Hund v. Bradley et al., No. 20-cv-1176 (W.D.N.Y), or the state case challenging this guidance, Sportsmen's Tavern LLC v. New York State Liquor Authority, No. 20-1360 (N.Y. App. Div. 4th Dep't), that may materially affect this case, including the modification or termination of any injunction. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 06/14 9:48 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 6/1/2021. (Court Reporter present) (wv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/27 10:00 AM
ORDER. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding the parties' May 26, 2021 status letter, Dkt. No. 32, on June 1, 2021 at 12 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
32 32 misc Letter Wed 05/26 2:24 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from all counsel dated May 26, 2021 re: order issued by the Second Circuit in Hund v. Bradley et al., no. 20-3908 (2d Cir.). Document filed by Vincent G. Bradley..(Conrad, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
31 31 order Order Mon 11/30 4:30 PM
ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the November 30, 2020 teleconference, this case is stayed pending the briefing and resolution of the proceedings currently before the Appellate Division in Sportmen's Tavern LLC v. New York State Liquor Authority, Dkt No. 20-1360 (N.Y. App. Div. 4th Dep't) and the before the Second Circuit in Hund v. Bradley et al., no. 20-3908 (2d Cir.). The parties are directed to inform the Court by joint letter as soon as either of these proceedings is resolved. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 11/30 5:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 11/30/2020. (Court Reporter Lisa Smith) (wv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
30 30 order Order Wed 11/25 12:08 PM
ORDER. The conference schedule for November 25, 2020 is adjourned to November 30, 2020 at 2 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
29 29 misc Letter Mon 11/23 3:58 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Matthew L. Conrad dated November 23, 2020 re: pending appeals in related cases. Document filed by Vincent G. Bradley..(Conrad, Matthew)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/23 10:37 AM
ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the November 20, 2020 conference, the Court declines to set a briefing schedule for Defendant's proposed motion to dismiss at this time. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 23, 2020, Dkt No. 19, is adjourned. The Court directs the parties to confer and submit a joint letter to the Court no later than 3 p.m. on November 24, 2020, regarding how they propose to proceed given the procedural posture of the two other lawsuits challenging the SLA guidance discussed during the November 20, 2020 conference. The Court will hold a teleconference on November 25, 2020 at 10 a.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 11/23 9:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2020. (Court Reporter present) (wv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
27 27 order Order on Motion for Conference Tue 11/17 8:43 AM
ORDER granting26 Letter Motion for Conference. Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference is granted. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding defendant's proposed motion to dismiss on November 20, 2020 at 1 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
26 26 motion Conference Mon 11/16 12:08 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Matthew L. Conrad dated November 16, 2020. Document filed by Vincent G. Bradley..(Conrad, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
25 25 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 11/13 10:22 AM
ORDER denying24 Motion to Dismiss. In the Court's order dated September 23, 2020, counsel was directed to review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. Dkt. No. 19. Pursuant to the Court's Individual Rule 2(C), pre-motion submissions are required for motions to dismiss. Defendant did not file a pre-motion submission before filing a motion to dismiss on November 12, 2020. Dkt. No. 24. Accordingly, that motion is denied without prejudice. If defendant wishes to renew its motion at a later date, it is directed to do so in compliance with the Court's Individual Rule 2(C). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
24 24 motion Dismiss Thu 11/12 5:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Vincent G. Bradley..(Conrad, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration of Matthew L. Conrad,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/21 10:48 AM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's request for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt No. 21, is granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to November 12, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/21 2:53 AM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jonathan Corbett dated 10/21/2020 re:21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Matthew L. Conrad dated October 20, 2020. . Document filed by 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc., Columbus Ale House, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., Jukimoo, LLC, New York Independent Venue Association, Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Hearing Transcript
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
21 21 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/20 5:54 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Matthew L. Conrad dated October 20, 2020. Document filed by Vincent G. Bradley..(Conrad, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Thu 09/24 8:45 AM
ORDER denying9 Motion for TRO; denying9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. On August 31, 2020, Plaintiffs filed an ex parte motion for an emergency temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Dkt No. 9. In accordance with the order dated September 1, 2020, Dkt No. 11, Defendant filed an opposition on September 11, 2020, Dkt No. 13, and on September 23, 2020, appeared to show cause why a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction should not issue. For the reasons stated on the record during the hearing held on September 23, 2020, Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, Dkt No. 1, is extended to October 29, 2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt No. 9. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/23/2020) (mro)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 09/24 8:37 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/23/2020) (mro)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 09/23 3:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 9/23/2020. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (W. Joseph)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/24 8:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Vincent G. Bradley answer due 10/29/2020. (mro)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 10/01 4:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 9/23/2020. (Daniels, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/17 2:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:9 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . pursuant to 17 ORDER granting leave to file excess pages . Document filed by 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc., Columbus Ale House, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., Jukimoo, LLC, New York Independent Venue Association, Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Menu of The Graham,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Photo of Dinner Service At The Graham,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Menu of The Turk's Inn
17 17 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 09/17 2:37 PM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Dkt No. 16, is granted. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their reply brief is extended to September 17, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
16 16 motion File Excess Pages Wed 09/16 9:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Memorandum in Reply to 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 9 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc., Columbus Ale House, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., Jukimoo, LLC, New York Independent Venue Association, Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Reply,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Menu of The Graham,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Photo of Dinner Service At The Graham,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Menu of The Turk's Inn
Saturday, September 12, 2020
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 09/12 9:30 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Vincent G. Bradley served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. Service was accepted by NY AG Managing Atty's Off.. Service was made by Mail. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(j)(2)(B), allowing service pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 307(2). Document filed by Jukimoo, LLC; Upstate Shows, Inc.; Infinity on Main, Inc.; Turks Group, LLC; Columbus Ale House, Inc.; Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc.; Jayarvee, Inc.; New York Independent Venue Association; 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC; Capitol Enterprises, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USPS Proof of Delivery
Friday, September 11, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/11 7:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Lawrence Conrad on behalf of Vincent G. Bradley..(Conrad, Matthew)
Related: [-]
13 13 25 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/11 7:19 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:9 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Vincent G. Bradley..(Conrad, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Dr. Elizabeth M. Dufort,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N,
Att: 16 Exhibit O,
Att: 17 Exhibit P,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q,
Att: 19 Exhibit R,
Att: 20 Exhibit S,
Att: 21 Exhibit T,
Att: 22 Exhibit U,
Att: 23 Exhibit V-1,
Att: 24 Exhibit V-2,
Att: 25 Exhibit W,
Att: 26 Exhibit X,
Att: 27 Exhibit Y,
Att: 28 Exhibit Z,
Att: 29 Exhibit AA,
Att: 30 Exhibit BB,
Att: 31 Exhibit CC,
Att: 32 Exhibit DD
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
12 12 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/02 9:18 AM
ORDER: On August 31, 2020, Plaintiffs filed an emergency motion for a temporary restraining order. Dkt No. 9. That motion is denied. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, "[t]he court may issue a temporary restraining order without written or oral notice to the adverse party or its attorney only if: (A) specific facts in an affidavit or a verified complaint clearly show that immediate and irreparable injury, loss, or damage will result to the movant before the adverse party can be heard in opposition; and (B) the movant's attorney certifies in writing any efforts made to give notice and the reasons why it should not be required." Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1). Plaintiffs have not "certifie[d] in writing...why [notice] should not be required." Id. Thus, the Court cannot issue an ex parte temporary restraining order under Rule 65(b)(1); see also Rule 4(B) of this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. But, by separate order to be entered today, the Court has ordered Defendant to show cause why a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction should not issue. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/1/2020) (mro)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 09/02 8:58 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is ORDERED to show cause on September 23, 2020 at 2 p.m. why a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction should not issue in this case. The hearing will take place by telephone. The parties are directed to consult the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for dial-in information and other instructions. Defendant is directed to respond to Plaintiffs' application for a temporary restraining order, Dkt No. 9, no later than September 11, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply to Defendants' opposition is due by September 16, 2020. Plaintiffs are directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendant by September 4, 2020 and to retain proof of service. ( Telephone Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/1/2020) (mro)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Status Report Tue 09/01 2:52 PM
STATUS REPORT. regarding service of Mot. for Emergency TRO. Document filed by 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc., Columbus Ale House, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., Jukimoo, LLC, New York Independent Venue Association, Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 09/02 8:58 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/11/2020 Replies due by 9/16/2020. (mro)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
9 9 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Mon 08/31 5:44 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ., MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc., Columbus Ale House, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., Jukimoo, LLC, New York Independent Venue Association, Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of NYIVA (Exhibit A),
Att: 2 Affidavit of Jukimoo, LLC (Exhibit B)
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/31 3:00 PM
ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT PRO HAC VICE granting6 Motion for Jonathan Corbett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/31/2020) (mro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
7 7 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 08/27 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Courts Emergency Rules. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/26/2020) (ks)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/26 4:11 PM
AMENDED MOTION for Jonathan Corbett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc., Columbus Ale House, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., Jukimoo, LLC, New York Independent Venue Association, Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Corbett,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from Cal. S. Ct.,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 08/26 11:05 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vincent G. Bradley..(pne)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/26 8:25 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 4 MOTION for Jonathan Corbett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21324378. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT STATE OF CALIFORNIA; missing Proposed Order; NOTARIZED AFFIDAVIT;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 08/26 11:00 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 08/26 11:03 AM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 08/26 11:04 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 08/26 11:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Corbett. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Vincent G. Bradley. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 08/26 4:13 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 AMENDED MOTION for Jonathan Corbett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/25 5:17 PM
MOTION for Jonathan Corbett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21324378. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc., Columbus Ale House, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., Jukimoo, LLC, New York Independent Venue Association, Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 08/25 4:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vincent G. Bradley, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc., Columbus Ale House, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., Jukimoo, LLC, New York Independent Venue Association, Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/25 4:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/25 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Vincent G. Bradley. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21323104)Document filed by Jukimoo, LLC, Upstate Shows, Inc., Infinity on Main, Inc., Turks Group, LLC, Columbus Ale House, Inc., Rapids Theater Niagara Falls USA, Inc., Jayarvee, Inc., New York Independent Venue Association, 49 Illinois Restaurant, LLC, Capitol Enterprises, Inc...(Corbett, Jonathan)
Related: [-]