City of Syracuse, NY et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-06885 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Nov 18, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 09, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 24, 2021 3:56 AM EST |
Amicus
Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Farhang & Medcoff, PLLC 4801 E BROADWAY BLVD, STE 311
Tucson, AZ 85711 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
District of Columbia
District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General 400 6th St. NW, Suite 10th Floor
Washington, DC 20001 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
City of Hartford, CT
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
City of Durham, NC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
City of Dayton, OH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Regina Lombardo
Washington, DC 20002
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Barr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
U.S. Department of Justice 99 New York Ave. NE
Washington, DC 20002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Prosecutors Against Gun Violence
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Brady United Against Gun Violence
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Zachary Fort
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Frederick Barton
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Polymer80, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Chicago, IL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund
450 Lexington Ave. P.O. Box 4184
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund
450 Lexington Ave. P.O. Box 4184
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Syracuse, NY
Office of the Mayor 233 E. Washington St. 201 City Hall
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of San Jose, CA
200 East Santa Clara Street 18th Floor
San Jose, CA 95113 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Columbia, SC
1737 Main Street P.O. Box 147
Columbia, SC 29217 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
148 | 148
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 02/10 10:34 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to101 Notice of Appeal, filed by Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc., Zachary Fort, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Frederick Barton USCA Case Number 21-00191 The underlying action in this appeal has been dismissed pursuant to the parties' stipulation. See City of Syracuse v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, No. 20-CV-6885, Dkt. No. 145. The parties to this appeal agree the dismissal of the underlying action moots this appeal. See Dkt. No. 119 (Letter). The appeal is accordingly DISMISSED as moot.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 2/10/2023..(nd) |