NUNEZ et al v. B. BRAUN MEDICAL INC. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward G Smith |
Case #: | 5:20-cv-04195 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Jan 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 22, 2021 5:48 AM EST |
Defendant
B. BRAUN MEDICAL INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THE RETIREMENT COMMITTEE OF B. BRAUN MEDICAL INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF B. BRAUN MEDICAL INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-30
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHNNY CHU
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TANIA NUNEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASHOK D PANDYA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID E STERN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |