Gaffney v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Case #: | 6:14-cv-02017 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2014 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 16, 2014 8:54 AM EST |
Defendant
Biomet Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet LLC
|
|
Defendant
Biomet Orthopedics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet US Reconstruction LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Gaffney
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 11, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 Case transferred to Northern Indiana per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 93. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (alew, ) | |
Tuesday, June 03, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Greenville County. (Lay, John) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/6/2014) (alew, ). (alew, ). Modified on 6/6/2014 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user(alew, ). | |
Att: 1 (6/6/2014) Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Removal | ||
Monday, June 02, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Extending Defendants Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, James Gaffney. Response to Motion due by 6/19/2014. No proposed order.(Lay, John). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 6/2/2014; modified to add motion relief (alew, ). | |
Thursday, May 29, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Extending Defendants Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, James Gaffney. (Lay, John) | |
Thursday, May 22, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC re1 Notice of Removal, 2 Civil Cover Sheet,6 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1,5 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1,3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories,4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (alew, ) | |
6 | 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Biomet Inc.(alew, ) | |
5 | 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Biomet US Reconstruction LLC.(alew, ) | |
4 | 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(alew, ) | |
3 | 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC.(alew, ) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2014-CP 23-2184 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-5350040), filed by Biomet Inc, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(alew, ) | |
Att: 1 State Court Documents |