Minden Pictures, Inc. v. The Excitant Group, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-08146 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 03, 2021 12:57 AM PST |
Defendant
The Excitant Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Minden Pictures, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Fri 01/22 11:28 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (mrgo) |
|
Att: 1 Dismissal | ||
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 01/13 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 01/07 10:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson re: Notice of Settlement28 . The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of the action or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Settlement
Mon 01/04 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 12/22 4:24 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss22 , calendared for December 28, 2020 is vacated, and the matter is taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 12/23 9:01 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Before the Court is a Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant The Excitant Group, LLC (Defendant). (Dkt. No.22 (Motion).) For the reasons stated above, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. See minute order for details. (lom) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 12/11 1:46 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 22 filed by Defendant The Excitant Group, LLC. (Albert, Kendra) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Fri 12/04 11:03 AM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 22 filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 11/25 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant The Excitant Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Albert, Kendra) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 11/25 3:06 PM
Text Only Entry Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss filed on November 25, 202020 is stricken for having been filed on 26 days notice in violation of Local Rule 6-1, which required a minimum of 28 days notice. The Motion is terminated without prejudice to it being re-filed in accordance with the Local Rules. The Motion to Dismiss filed on November 3, 202015 is denied as moot following the filing of the First Amended Complaint. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (JS) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 11/25 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by plaintiff The Excitant Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Albert, Kendra) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 24, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 11/30 10:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court is in receipt of a First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No.18 ) filed by plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc. ("Plaintiff"). The Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No.15 ) filed by defendant The Excitant Group, LLC is denied as moot. The hearing calendared for December 7, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. See minute order for details. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, November 11, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/11 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN LIEU OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. 15) filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
18 | 18
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Wed 11/11 2:05 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 11/06 11:48 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Excitant Group, LLC (Albert, Kendra) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 11/05 1:13 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 11/03 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant The Excitant Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Albert, Kendra) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Kendra K. Albert, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 09, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 10/09 3:37 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Excitant Group, LLC answer now due 11/3/2020, filed by Defendant The Excitant Group, LLC.(Albert, Kendra) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Appearance
Thu 10/08 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kendra K. Albert on behalf of Defendant The Excitant Group, LLC (Albert, Kendra) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 10/08 10:54 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance11 . The following error(s) was/were found: The attached document is blank. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Appearance
Wed 10/07 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kendra K. Albert on behalf of Defendant The Excitant Group, LLC (Attorney Kendra K. Albert added to party The Excitant Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Albert, Kendra) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 09/30 2:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc., upon Defendant The Excitant Group, LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marie Bernard\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
10
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/10 2:45 PM
ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (See order for further details) (yl) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 09/09 3:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant The Excitant Group, LLC. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 09/09 3:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 09/09 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 09/04 4:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Fri 09/04 4:06 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 09/04 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc., identifying THE EXCITANT GROUP, LLC. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 09/04 4:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/04 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27948794 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Minden Pictures, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |