In re: The Little Shell Pembina Nation, The Great Chippewa Nation
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Alice R Senechal |
Case #: | 3:20-mc-00008 |
Cause | 25:1302 Tribal Constitutional Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2021 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/01 9:44 AM
Civil Case Terminated, see Mandate filed at7 . (lf) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 03/03 4:30 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to4 Notice of Appeal filed by Little Shell Pembina Nation, The (pb) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
USCA Judgment
Fri 12/18 1:22 PM
USCA JUDGMENT as to4 Notice of Appeal filed by Little Shell Pembina Nation, The. USCA8 Orders that this appeal be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (sj) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Thu 10/22 10:59 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 121000058 re4 Notice of Appeal filed by Little Shell Pembina Nation, The (mf) |
||
Tuesday, October 20, 2020 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 10/20 10:15 AM
USCA Case Number 20-3189 for4 Notice of Appeal. (pb) |
||
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
NOA Supplement
Mon 10/19 11:22 AM
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re4 Notice of Appeal (pb) |
|
utility
Docket Correction
Mon 10/19 11:11 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:3 NOTICE. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and refiled as NOTICE OF APPEAL at4 . (pb) |
||
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 10/19 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to2 Order by Little Shell Pembina Nation, The. Filing fee: Not Paid. (pb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/05 3:40 PM
NOTICE by Little Shell Pembina Nation, The Notice of Appeal (Delorme, Breanna) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/11 11:42 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying request for issuance of a criminal complaint. (AS) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 09/09 2:14 PM
Proposed Complaint by Little Shell Pembina Nation, The (Attachment #1 Supplement to Complaint, #2 Affidavit of Karyence Ronald Delorme dated 9/6/20) (td) |