District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Carl J Nichols
Case #: 1:20-cv-02658
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2020
Case in other court:USCA, 20-05302 20-05381
Last checked: Monday Nov 02, 2020 4:25 AM EST
Defendant
WILBUR L. ROSS, JR.
in his official capacity as Secretary of Commerce 1401 Constitution Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20230
Represented By
Stuart Justin Robinson
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
official capacity as President of the United States 1600 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20500
Represented By
Stuart Justin Robinson
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
1401 Constitution Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20230
Represented By
Stuart Justin Robinson
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Movant
JEFFREY A. LOVITKY
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Lovitky
Jeffrey A. Lovitky, Attorney At Law
contact info
Movant
NETCHOICE
Represented By
Jacob Alan Sommer
Zwillgen PLLC
contact info
Movant
REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By
KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Reporters Committee For Freedom Of The Press
contact info
Plaintiff
BYTEDANCE LTD.
Represented By
Alexander Adelman Berengaut
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Beth Susan Brinkmann
Covington & Burling, LLP
contact info
Mitchell Aaron Kamin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Megan Anne Crowley
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
John Edward Hall
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Anders Linderot
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Megan Christine Keenan
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TIKTOK INC.
Represented By
Alexander Adelman Berengaut
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Beth Susan Brinkmann
Covington & Burling, LLP
contact info
Mitchell Aaron Kamin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Megan Anne Crowley
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
John Edward Hall
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Anders Linderot
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Megan Christine Keenan
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Friday, January 15, 2021
notice Notice of QC Fri 01/15 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re64 Status Report; emailed to bbrinkmann@cov.com, cc'd 32 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. Attorney signature must match login/password in future filings. (zeg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
order .Order Wed 01/13 12:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties'64 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' shall respond to Plaintiffs'1 Complaint by February 18, 2021 . It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall file another Joint Status Report by February 11, 2021 , advising the Court on whether any further extension is warranted. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 13, 2021. (lccjn3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/13 1:54 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/18/2021. Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2021. (zcal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
64 64 2 pgs misc Status Report Tue 01/12 3:30 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by BYTEDANCE LTD., TIKTOK INC.. (Brinkmann, Beth)
Related: [-]