California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-06686
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2020
Terminated:Feb 04, 2021
Last checked: Monday Mar 22, 2021 1:37 AM PDT
Defendant
MaxPower Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By
Nancy Lynn Tompkins
Roger Cook Law
contact info
Roger L. Cook
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rohm Semiconductor USA, LLC
Represented By
James R. Hannah
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Shannon Hedvat
Kramer Levin Naftalis And Frankel LLP
contact info
Aaron M. Frankel
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Lisa Kobialka
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 04 2021
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 41 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
GPO Feb 04 2021
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/4/2021. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)

Docket last updated: 06/15/2021 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 11, 2021
65 65 misc Transcript Thu 03/11 4:22 PM
Transcript of Proceedings of the official Zoom recording held on 02/04/21, before Judge Vince Chhabria. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590. Tape Number: FTR 10:37 - 10:49. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 4/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2021. (tgj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 64 Transcript Order (s)64
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
64 64 misc Transcript Order Tue 03/09 3:13 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/4/21 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Rohm Semiconductor USA, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kobialka, Lisa)
Related: [-]
63 63 appeal Transcript Designation Form Tue 03/09 3:08 PM
Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 2/4/2021 before Judge Chhabria, Appellants' Transcript Purchase Order (Kobialka, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
62 62 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 03/04 7:23 AM
USCA Case Number 2021-1709 USCA Federal Circuit for61 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Rohm Semiconductor USA, LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]