Perez et al v. Discover Bank
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Illston |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-06896 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court County of San Mateo, 20CIV03045 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 31, 2021 1:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Discover Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Flavio Guzman Magana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iliana Perez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
128 | 128
5
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 04/04 7:37 AM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 127 Stipulation to Modify Briefing for Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (ec, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
127 | 127
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 04/03 10:39 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re126 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Re: Modified Briefing Schedule On Plaintiffs Motion For Attorneys Fees And Costs filed by Discover Bank. (Strickland, Julia) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
126 | 126
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 04/01 7:56 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Emiliano Galicia Felix, Josue Jimenez Magana, Iliana Perez. Motion for Attorney Fees Hearing set for 8/30/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/15/2024. Replies due by 4/22/2024.(Miazad, Ossai) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Ernest Herrera, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Ossai Miazad, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G |