Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lori V Vaughan
Case #: 6:20-bk-05582
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
1069 Restaurant Group, LLC
1069 W Morse Blvd
Winter Park, FL 32789-3780
Represented By
R Scott Shuker
Shuker & Dorris, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801

Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Thursday, November 26, 2020
99 99 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 11/27 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 11/26/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #95 )
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
98 98 motion Motion to Appear pro hac vice Wed 11/25 2:04 PM
Motion of Daren Brinkman to Appear pro hac vice Filed by David Lloyd Merrill on behalf of Creditor Committee Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims (Merrill, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
97 97 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 11/24 12:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Lloyd Merrill on behalf of Creditor Committee Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims. (Merrill, David)
Related: [-]
96 96 motion Application to Employ/Retain Tue 11/24 12:37 PM
Application to Employ Brinkman Law Group PC as Attorneys for Unsecured Creditors Filed by David Lloyd Merrill on behalf of Creditor Committee Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims (Merrill, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
95 95 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 11/24 11:41 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Kelsi J Hunt for Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded Related [+]. Service Instructions: David Merrill is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lee Hue, Karla)
Related: [-] 93
94 94 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 11/24 9:14 AM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Maingate GC, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor 1069 Restaurant Group, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2020 at 02:30 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Shuker, R)
Related: [-] 89
court Accompanying Orders List Proposed Order Submission Reminder Tue 11/24 2:58 PM
The Application to Employ/Retain (Doc96 ) appears to be the type of motion or application listed on the Court's Accompanying Orders List posted on the Court's website[LINK:(Click here to view)] . Local Rule 9072-1(b)(1) states that if a motion or application is listed on the Accompanying Orders List, counsel may submit a proposed order at the time that the motion or application is filed. Counsel for the moving party is directed to verify that the motion or application is listed on the Accompanying Orders List, and if so, to submit a proposed order granting the motion or approving the application. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
93 93 motion Motion to Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/23 2:05 PM
Motion of Kelsi J Hunt to Appear pro hac vice Filed by David Lloyd Merrill on behalf of Creditor Committee Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims (Merrill, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Mailing Matrix
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Mon 11/23 12:32 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 12/08/2020 02:30 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion to Dismiss Case of Maingate GC (Applicable Debtor). Doc89 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: R Scott Shuker is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Telephonic Appearance Requirement: Effective March 16, 2020, and continuing until further notice, Judges in all Divisions will conduct all preliminary and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. For Judges Colton and Williamson, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com). For Judges Delano, Funk, Jackson, Jennemann, McEwen, and Vaughan, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Call (866-582-6878). Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 89
Friday, November 20, 2020
92 92 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 11/21 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 11/20/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #87 )
91 91 misc Proof of Service Fri 11/20 12:35 PM
Proof of Service of Order Approving Application of 1069 Restaurant Group, LLC, et al. to Employ Booth Financial Advisory Services, LLC, as Debtors' Financial Advisor Nunc Pro Tunc to October 5, 2020. Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor 1069 Restaurant Group, LLC Related [+]. (Shuker, R)
Related: [-] 86
90 90 misc Proof of Service Fri 11/20 6:09 AM
Proof of Service of Notice and Order Scheduling Preliminary Hearing on motion for Relief from Stay (Doc. 88). Filed by Roman V Hammes on behalf of Creditor Rudy Arribas, Trustee of the Alfonso Arribas Trust, dated November 26, 2003 Related [+]. (Hammes, Roman)
Related: [-] 88
Thursday, November 19, 2020
89 89 motion Motion to Dismiss Case Thu 11/19 1:20 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case of Maingate GC (Applicable Debtor) . Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor 1069 Restaurant Group, LLC (Shuker, R)
Related: [-]