California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 9:20-bk-11208
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Figueroa Mountain Brewing, LLC
45 Industrial Way
Buellton, CA 93427-9565
Represented By
Christopher E Prince
Lesnick Prince & Pappas LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


1. Figueroa Mountain Brewing announces Chapter 11 bankruptcy filing (pacbiztimes.com)
Submitted Tue 10/06/2020
Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
103 103 motion Strike (motion) Wed 10/28 3:38 PM
Motion to strike / Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike Small Business Debtor Designation And Subchapter V Election By Debtor In Chapter 11 Petition; Declarations Of Robert P. Mahoney And Juliet Y. Oh In Support Thereof Filed by Creditor White Winston Select Asset Funds, LLC (Oh, Juliet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
102 102 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/22 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 95 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
101 101 nef Request for Removal from Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 10/22 4:01 PM
Request for Removal from Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Request to be Added Filed by Nilmeier, Lisa. (Nilmeier, Lisa)
Related: [-]
100 100 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 10/22 12:14 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) with Proof of Service Filed by Buchman, Joseph. (Buchman, Joseph)
Related: [-]
99 99 notice Notice of motion/application Thu 10/22 11:52 AM
Notice of motion/application of Debtor and Debtor in Possession for Order Authorizing Employment of Lesnick Prince & Pappas LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Debtor Figueroa Mountain Brewing, LLC Related [+]. (Prince, Christopher)
Related: [-] 98 Application to Employ Lesnick Prince & Pappas LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel ; Declaration of Christopher E. Prince Filed by Debtor Figueroa Mountain Brewing, LLC
98 98 31 pgs motion Employ (motion) Thu 10/22 11:48 AM
Application to Employ Lesnick Prince & Pappas LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel ; Declaration of Christopher E. Prince Filed by Debtor Figueroa Mountain Brewing, LLC (Prince, Christopher)
Related: [-]
97 97 court Transcript Thu 10/22 7:38 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/14/20 RE: MOTION REGARDING CHAPTER 11 FIRST DAY MOTIONS. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 01/20/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: BRIGGS REPORTING COMPANY, INC., Telephone number 310-410-4151.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/29/2020. Redaction Request Due By 11/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/23/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 01/20/2021. (Steinhauer, Holly)
Related: [-]