City and County of Honolulu v. GMP Hawaii, Inc. et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | J Michael Seabright |
Referred: | Barry M Kurren |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00256 |
Nature of Suit | 871 Federal Tax Suits - IRS-Third Party 26 USC 7609 |
Cause | 26:6502 IRS:Enforcement of tax liens |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 14, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 10:36 PM HST |
Defendant
GMP Hawaii, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City and County of Honolulu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
order
Stipulation for Dismissal and Order
Wed 10/14 2:41 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER by Internal Revenue Service - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/14/2015. This interpleader action and all claims are dismissed with prejudice. (emt, ) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation
Wed 10/14 8:33 AM
STIPULATION To Dismiss With Prejudice by Internal Revenue Service. (Watson, Rickey) |
|
misc
Court's Certificate of Service
Wed 10/14 2:46 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of36 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on October 14, 2015. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
order
Stipulation and Order Order of Distribution of Funds
Tue 08/11 5:12 PM
STIPULATION TO DISTRIBUTE FUNDS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 8/10/2015. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Att: 1 USA's Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/06 8:25 AM
STIPULATION to Distribute Funds by Internal Revenue Service. (Watson, Rickey) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/20 2:27 PM
Defendant GMP Hawaii, Inc.'s DISCLAIMER - by GMP Hawaii, Inc. (emt, ) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/20 10:24 AM
NOTICE by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd. (Defendant Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd.'s Disclaimer) Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd.. (Muzzi, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
order
Stipulation and Order 2 - Set Deadlines
Tue 06/09 10:35 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS: APPROVED AND SO ORDERED on 6/09/2015 by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Dispositive Motions cutoff extended from 6/9/2015; dispositive motions due by 9/8/2015.) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Mon 06/08 4:02 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions by Internal Revenue Service. (Watson, Rickey) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
order
Stipulation and Order 2 - Set Deadlines
Tue 04/14 12:52 PM
SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS; USA's Certificate of Service. APPROVED AND SO ORDERED on 4/14/2015 by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Dispositive Motions cutoff extended from 4/9/2015; dispositive motions due by 6/9/2015.) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, April 10, 2015 | ||
misc
Advisory Entry
Fri 04/10 8:37 AM
ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the27 Second Stipulation to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions filed by Internal Revenue Service, may be submitted to Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren (kurren_orders@hid.uscourts.gov) for consideration. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations, and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (emt, ) |
||
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/09 9:00 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions by Internal Revenue Service. (Watson, Rickey) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/01 5:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd. (Muzzi, Christopher) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Stipulation and Order 2 - Set Deadlines
Fri 03/06 3:28 PM
FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (Dispositive motions extended from 3/9/2015 until 4/9/2015.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 3/6/2015. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2015 | ||
misc
Corrective Entry
Tue 03/03 8:44 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY re: docket entry number 24 Notice of Taking Deposition upon Oral Examination, filed by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd.. Please be advised that discovery-type documents are generally not filed with the court (See Fed.R.Civ.P.5(d) re: filing/non-filing of discovery). For the filing party's future reference, the party may file a Certificate of Service with reference to such discovery matter. (afc) |
||
Monday, March 02, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/02 4:05 PM
NOTICE by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd. of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination; Exhibit A [Re: Ralph Fuller, Jr.]; Certificate of Service Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd.. (Muzzi, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 07, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd. (Muzzi, Christopher) | |
22 | 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd. (Muzzi, Christopher) | |
Monday, September 15, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd.. (Muzzi, Christopher) | |
20 | 20 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by City and County of Honolulu.(Ota, Ryan) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, September 08, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held.The Dispositive Motions Deadline is set for 3/9/2015. The Court will determine a hearing date for dispositive motions after they are filed.After the Court rules on the dispositive motions, counsel shall contact Judge Barry M. Kurren's Courtroom Manager (808-541-1306) to schedule a Scheduling Conference.(C8 no record 9:30-9:30am.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry | |
Thursday, August 28, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 Scheduling Conference Statement .(Ota, Ryan) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
17 | 17 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Watson, Rickey) | |
Wednesday, August 27, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint for Interpleader; Certificate of Service by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd..(Muzzi, Christopher) | |
15 | 15 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service . (Muzzi, Christopher) | |
Monday, August 25, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd. re12 Answer to Complaint,13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Muzzi, Christopher) | |
13 | 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd.. (Muzzi, Christopher) | |
12 | 12 ANSWER to1 Complaint for Interpleader by Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd..(Muzzi, Christopher) | |
11 | 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting .(Ota, Ryan) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, August 04, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 ANSWER and CLAIM to1 Complaint by Internal Revenue Service.(Watson, Rickey) Modified on 8/5/2014 (emt, ). | |
Thursday, July 31, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City and County of Honolulu. Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd. served on 6/5/2014, answer due 6/26/2014. (Ota, Ryan) | |
8 | 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City and County of Honolulu. GMP Hawaii, Inc. served on 6/5/2014, answer due 6/26/2014. (Ota, Ryan) | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City and County of Honolulu. Internal Revenue Service served on 6/3/2014, answer due 8/4/2014. (Ota, Ryan) | |
Thursday, May 29, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to GMP Hawaii, Inc., Hawaii Pacific Finance, Ltd., Internal Revenue Service. (gab, ) | |
5 | 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(gab, ) | |
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request To Waive Service of Summons Form, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons Form | ||
4 | 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 9/8/2014 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN.. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/29/14.(gab, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry | |
Att: 1 Memo from Clerk | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 14-00256 JMS-BMK on all further pleadings . (gab, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. | |
2 | 2 Summons (Proposed) (Ota, Ryan) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1395871.), filed by City and County of Honolulu.(Ota, Ryan) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |