Congregation Yesheos Yakov et al v. The State Of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nelson Stephen Roman |
Case #: | 7:20-cv-08580 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 12, 2021 6:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Andrew M. Cuomo
|
|
Defendant
State Of New York
|
|
Plaintiff
Congregation Netzach Yisroel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Congregation Yesheos Yakov
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Congregation Oholei Shem D'Nitra
Terminated: 10/21/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 11/16 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Andrew M. Cuomo, State Of New York. Document filed by Congregation Yesheos Yakov, Congregation Netzach Yisroel. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
service
Amended Summons Issued
Wed 10/21 3:59 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Cuomo, State Of New York..(jgo) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
Tue 10/20 3:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to State of New York; Andrew M. Cuomo, re:8 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Congregation Netzach Yisroel, Congregation Yesheos Yakov..(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 10/20 2:52 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ronald David Coleman to RE-FILE Document No. 9 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Remove the "on Amended Complaint" portion of "Summons on a Civil Action";. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) |
||
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
Mon 10/19 6:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to State of New York; Andrew M. Cuomo, re:8 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Congregation Netzach Yisroel, Congregation Yesheos Yakov..(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/19 6:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending6 Amended Complaint, against Andrew M. Cuomo, State Of New York.Document filed by Congregation Yesheos Yakov, Congregation Netzach Yisroel. Related document:6 Amended Complaint,..(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Mon 10/19 4:06 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ronald David Coleman to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF case caption must list all of the parties and must not include 'et al'. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 10/19 4:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ronald David Coleman to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
Fri 10/16 2:43 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to State of New York; Andrew M. Cuomo, re:6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Congregation Netzach Yisroel, Congregation Yesheos Yakov..(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 10/16 2:22 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Andrew M. Cuomo, State Of New York.Document filed by Congregation Yesheos Yakov, Congregation Netzach Yisroel. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 10/16 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Andrew M. Cuomo, State Of New York. Document filed by Congregation Oholei Shem D'Nitra. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/16 1:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Cuomo, State Of New York..(dnh) |
|
misc
Case Opening Fee Paid via Pay.gov
Fri 10/16 1:19 PM
Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for1 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-22137511, paid on 10/14/2020..(dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 10/16 1:30 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ronald David Coleman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The State Of New York ; Governor of New York Andrew M. Cuomo ; Congregation Yesheos Yakov, by and through Rabbi Moshe Rosner; Congregation Netzach Yisroel, by and through Rabbi Chaim Leibish Rottenberg; Congregation Oholei Shem D'Nitra, by and through Rabbi Samuel Teitelbaum. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 10/16 1:33 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ronald David Coleman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 10/16 1:54 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 10/16 1:55 PM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 10/16 1:55 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 10/16 2:23 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Alison J. Nathan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt) |
||
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
misc
Case Opening Fee Due
Thu 10/15 8:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Ronald David Coleman. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for1 Complaint,. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 10/20/2020..(dnh) |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 10/14 7:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The State of New York; Andrew M. Cuomo, in his official capacity as Governor of New York State, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Congregation Netzach Yisroel, by and through Rabbi Chaim Leibish Rottenberg, Congregation Oholei Shem D'Nitra, by and through Rabbi Samuel Teitelbaum, Congregation Yesheos Yakov, by and through Rabbi Moshe Rosner..(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 10/14 7:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/14 7:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Cuomo, The State Of New York. Document filed by Congregation Yesheos Yakov, by and through Rabbi Moshe Rosner, Congregation Netzach Yisroel, by and through Rabbi Chaim Leibish Rottenberg, Congregation Oholei Shem D'Nitra, by and through Rabbi Samuel Teitelbaum..(Coleman, Ronald) |