Winslow v. Foster et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Philip A Brimmer |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-03102 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1121 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 13, 2021 3:29 AM MDT |
Counter Claimant
Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Kristie E Foster
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Ryan A Newman
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Trinity Winslow
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kristie E Foster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan A Newman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trinity Winslow
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Dismiss
Fri 08/20 3:54 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Counter Defendant Trinity Winslow, Plaintiff Trinity Winslow.(Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Mon 08/23 9:25 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to30 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Counter Defendant Trinity Winslow, Plaintiff Trinity Winslow filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) |
||
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/11 9:03 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 August 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion for Withdrawal of Heather N. Tilley (Dkt.#27 ) is GRANTED and Ms. Tilley shall be permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) |
|
order
Memorandum
Wed 08/11 7:49 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Kristie E Foster, Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Ryan A Newman. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/11/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec) |
||
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/10 5:01 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Counter Claimants Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman, Defendants Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman. (Tilley, Heather) |
|
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/09 2:08 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Counter Claimants Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman, Defendants Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman. (Lemire, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minute Order
Tue 07/13 9:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/13/2021 re:24 Status Report. The parties shall file their dismissal papers or a status report on or before August 9, 2021 . Text Only Entry (pabsec2) |
|
Friday, July 09, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Fri 07/09 3:14 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Counter Defendant Trinity Winslow, Plaintiff Trinity Winslow. (Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 01/27 9:28 AM
REPLY to Response to19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Counter Defendant Trinity Winslow, Plaintiff Trinity Winslow. (Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 01/20 6:07 PM
RESPONSE to19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Counter Claimants Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman. (Lemire, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/07 9:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/06/2021. (slibi, ) |
|
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/07 9:31 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/6/2021. Discovery due by 9/24/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2021. Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Wed 12/30 4:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims by Counter Defendant Trinity Winslow, Plaintiff Trinity Winslow.(Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A 2019-10-27 Instagram, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B Affidavit of Trinity Winslow | ||
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 12/30 3:53 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Counter Defendant Trinity Winslow, Plaintiff Trinity Winslow. (Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 12/29 1:33 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/29/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Tue 12/29 1:17 PM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03102-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 12/09 3:55 PM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Trinity Winslow by Ryan A Newman, Kristie E Foster, Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC.(Lemire, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 11/25 2:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman, filed by Trinity Winslow.(Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 11/13 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather Nicole Tilley on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Heather Nicole Tilley added to party Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Nicole Tilley added to party Kristie E Foster(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Nicole Tilley added to party Ryan A Newman(pty:dft) (Tilley, Heather) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Thu 11/12 1:34 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12 November 2020. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Dkt. #11 ), which was docketed as a motion, is GRANTED. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1, a stipulation to an extension of 21 days or less is effective upon filing and otherwise in compliance with the rule "shall be effective on filing." A motion is not necessary for such a stipulation to be effective. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Wed 11/11 4:53 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman. (Lemire, Peter) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 11/11 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter C. Lemire on behalf of Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A NewmanAttorney Peter C. Lemire added to party Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter C. Lemire added to party Kristie E Foster(pty:dft), Attorney Peter C. Lemire added to party Ryan A Newman(pty:dft) (Lemire, Peter) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Mon 10/26 1:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trinity Winslow. Ryan A Newman served on 10/25/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Mon 10/26 1:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trinity Winslow. Kristie E Foster served on 10/25/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Mon 10/26 1:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trinity Winslow. Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 10/19 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shirin Chahal on behalf of Trinity WinslowAttorney Shirin Chahal added to party Trinity Winslow(pty:pla) (Chahal, Shirin) |
|
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 10/19 11:09 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 19 October 2020. Consent Form due by 12/23/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/30/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report re: Patent/Trademark
Fri 10/16 9:03 AM
Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jsalz, ) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 10/16 9:24 AM
SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (jsalz, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 10/16 8:55 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/15 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7541274)Attorney Daniel Thomas Goodwin added to party Trinity Winslow(pty:pla), filed by Trinity Winslow.(Goodwin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |