National Coalition on Black Civic Participation et al v. Wohl et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jed S Rakoff |
Referred: | Ona T Wang |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-08668 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 42:1985 Consipracy to interfere with civil rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 16, 2020 |
Case in other court: | U.S. Court of Appeals, 2nd Circ., 21-00232 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 14, 2021 4:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Burkman & Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Project 1599
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jacob Wohl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jack Burkman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Slaven
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Wolff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Winter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gene Steinberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Sferes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Coalition on Black Civic Participation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kate Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Hart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eda Daniel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
335 | 335
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/18 10:36 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:329 MOTION to Compel Defendants to immediately disclose whether they intend to testify at trial . . Document filed by Jacob Wohl..(Schwartz, David) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
334 | 334
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Compel
Fri 03/15 12:49 PM
ORDER granting326 Motion re:326 MOTION to permit Plaintiff Mary Winter to testify remotely at the upcoming trial .,329 MOTION to Compel Defendants to immediately disclose whether they intend to testify at trial . ; granting329 Motion to Compel. Although the Court granted leave for defendants to file oppositions to these motions by March 8, see Minute Entry of 2/27/2024, they have not done so. Accordingly, both motions in limine are hereby granted. Defendants must disclose to plaintiffs by no later than noon on Monday, March 18 whether they intend to testify at trial. If defendants answer in the affirmative, they must make themselves available for depositions to take place by Monday, April 1. If defendants answer in the negative or fail to answer by the specified time, the Court hereby precludes them from testifying at trial. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close documents 326 and 329 on the docket. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/15/2024) (ks) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 03/15 4:15 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 4/1/2024. (ks) |