Lechner v. Chippewa, County of et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | R Allan Edgar |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-00121 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2014 |
Re-opened: | Jan 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 16, 2014 10:31 PM EST |
defendant
Chippewa, County of
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Jeffrey Erickson
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Robin Lechner
|
|
defendant
Douglas Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Brian Peppler
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Robert Savoie
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
John Francis Lechner
#16111-040 Sandstone (FCI) Federal Correctional Institution P.O. Box 1000
Sandstone, MN 55072 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 12/15 10:58 AM
MANDATE of USCA re appeal18 Mandate issued with no costs taxed (mlc) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 11/23 12:57 PM
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal18 that District Court Judgment is AFFIRMED ; mandate to issue (cep) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
appeal
Receipt (Appeal Fee)
Tue 03/08 3:18 PM
RECEIPT: USCA appeal fee re18 by plaintiff John Francis Lechner in the amount of $505, receipt number MQ004454 (slk) |
||
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 02/17 11:36 AM
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal18 Order filed; Denying appellant's motion to proceed ifp. Lechner must pay the $505 appellate filing fee to the district court within thirty days of the entry of this order, or the appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution. (mlc) |
|
Att: 1 Letter from the USCA; No mention of the mandate | ||
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Denying IFP on Appeal (Able to Pay)
Thu 08/27 3:26 PM
ORDER DENYING IFP ON APPEAL because the court has certified that the appeal would not be taken in good faith: plaintiff to pay the entire appeal fee of 505.00 within 28 days or the appeal will be dismissed; ; signed by Judge R. Allan Edgar (Judge R. Allan Edgar, cam) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 08/27 4:21 PM
Copy of Order Denying IFP on Appeal (Able to Pay),24 sent via U.S. Mail to John Francis Lechner (mlc) |
||
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/12 1:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John Francis Lechner re MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis 22 (mlc) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/12 1:51 PM
MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis by plaintiff John Francis Lechner; (mlc) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documents | ||
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Deficiency Order (Appeal)
Mon 08/03 7:45 AM
DEFICIENCY ORDER regarding APPEAL: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the appeal fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (cam) |
|
Att: 1 (8/3/2015) Attachment Blank Financial Affidavit | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 08/03 11:15 AM
Copy of Deficiency Order (Appeal),21 sent via U.S. Mail to John Francis Lechner (mlc) |
||
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
appeal
Appellate Court Case Number
Wed 07/22 12:31 PM
CASE NUMBER 15-1822 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal18 (mkc) |
||
Friday, July 17, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Supplement
Fri 07/17 2:55 PM
SUPPLEMENT re Notice of Appeal18 with Certificate of Service (named as "Docketing Statement") by plaintiff John Francis Lechner (slk) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/13 4:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John Francis Lechner regarding, "Motion to Cure Deficiency" Please Note; No Motion To Cure Deficiency Was Attached To the Notice of Appeal (mlc) |
|
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 07/13 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re16 ,17 by plaintiff John Francis Lechner (mlc) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 07/13 4:33 PM
Copy of Notice of Appeal18 with docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to John Francis Lechner (mlc) |
||
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)
Mon 06/29 10:42 AM
JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for an appeal ; signed by Judge R. Allan Edgar (Judge R. Allan Edgar, cam) |
|
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Opinion
Mon 06/29 10:42 AM
OPINION AND ORDER ; signed by Judge R. Allan Edgar (Judge R. Allan Edgar, cam) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 06/29 1:19 PM
Certified Copy of Opinion16 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)17 sent via U.S. Mail to John Francis Lechner (mlc) |
||
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
service
Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service delivered to USM
Wed 06/24 11:29 AM
SECOND NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendant Robin Lechner (mkc) |
||
Wednesday, April 22, 2015 | ||
utility
Copies for Service Received
Wed 04/22 2:32 PM
COPIES FOR SERVICE received re Order15 (mlc) |
||
service
Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service delivered to USM
Wed 04/22 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendants Chippewa, County of, Jeffrey Erickson, Robin Lechner, Douglas Mitchell, Brian Peppler, Robert Savoie (mlc) |
||
Tuesday, April 14, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Regarding Service - Prisoner (Copies Needed)
Tue 04/14 3:23 PM
ORDER REGARDING SERVICE: within 14 days, plaintiff shall file a copy of this order and sufficient additional copies of the complaint for service upon defendants; upon receipt of the copies, the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, pjc) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 04/14 4:32 PM
Copy of complaint,3 , Order Regarding Service - Prisoner (Copies Needed),15 sent via U.S. Mail to John Francis Lechner (mlc) |
||
Thursday, January 29, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Change of Address - Prisoner or Pro Se
Thu 01/29 2:31 PM
CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff John Francis Lechner to 352 Bla Loc Row, Sault Ste Marie, MI 49783 (slk) |
|
Wednesday, January 07, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Wed 01/07 7:23 AM
ORDER granting8 motion for reconsideration re6 ,7 ; finding as moot11 motion for judgment on the pleadings ; signed by Judge R. Allan Edgar (Judge R. Allan Edgar, cam) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 01/07 8:19 AM
Copy of Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings13 sent via U.S. Mail to John Francis Lechner (mlc) |
||
Wednesday, December 31, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/31 1:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John Francis Lechner re MOTION for judgment on the pleadings named as, "Motion Requesting This Honorable Court Enter a Ruling" 11 (mlc) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Wed 12/31 1:02 PM
MOTION for judgment on the pleadings named as, "Motion Requesting This Honorable Court Enter a Ruling" by plaintiff John Francis Lechner; (mlc) |
|
Monday, December 29, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter to Court
Mon 12/29 3:27 PM
LETTER from plaintiff John Francis Lechner regarding future change of address to: 352 BlaLoc Row, Sault Ste. Marie, MI 49783 (slk) |
|
Monday, November 10, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John Francis Lechner re MOTION for reconsideration re6 ,7 named as, "Petitioner's Request for Civil Action Be Reinstated" 8 (mlc) | |
8 | 8 MOTION for reconsideration re6 ,7 named as, "Petitioner's Request for Civil Action Be Reinstated" by plaintiff John Francis Lechner;(mlc) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Signature Page with Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, October 23, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice ; signed by Judge R. Allan Edgar (Judge R. Allan Edgar, cam) | |
6 | 6 ORDER ; signed by Judge R. Allan Edgar (Judge R. Allan Edgar, cam) | |
Certified Copy of Order6 , Judgment Dismissing Case7 sent via U.S. Mail to John Francis Lechner (mlc) | ||
Tuesday, July 15, 2014 | ||
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory R. Grant on behalf of defendants Chippewa, County of, Jeffrey Erickson, Douglas Mitchell, Brian Peppler, Robert Savoie (Grant, Gregory) | ||
Thursday, June 19, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 LETTER from plaintiff John Francis Lechner regarding Subpoena Forms (sent ten subpoenas along with the Notice to Parties Regarding Civil Subpoenas)(mlc) | |
Att: 1 Response from Clerk Memo | ||
Wednesday, June 04, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL ORDER striking complaint3 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cpl) | |
Copy of Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper4 sent via U.S. Mail to John Francis Lechner (mlc) | ||
Monday, June 02, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 (STRICKEN) UNSIGNED CORRECTED COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by John Francis Lechner(mlc) Modified text on 6/3/2014 (mlc). Modified text on 7/2/2014 - per Order4 (mlc). Modified text on 7/8/2014 (mlc). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cover Letter | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Greeley indicating that this case is related to 2:11-cr-49, 2:12-cv-467 and 2:12-cv-468 (mlc) | |
1 | 1 (DISREGARD) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by John Francis Lechner(mlc) Modified text on 6/2/2014 - incorrect judge pairing listed on complaint (mlc). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cover Letter | ||
RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $400.00, receipt number MQ003678; amount paid to date $400.00 (mlc) | ||
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Chippewa, County of, Jeffrey Erickson, Robin Lechner, Douglas Mitchell, Brian Peppler, Robert Savoie (summons not provided) (mlc) | ||
(NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that complaint1 was filed in error and should be disregarded. The Dymo label had the incorrect judge pairing listed on the cover of the complaint. (mlc) |