Terkel et al v. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J Campbell Barker |
Case #: | 6:20-cv-00564 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 25, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 20, 2021 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Acting Chief Sherri A. Berger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Acting Secretary Norris Cochran
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director Rochelle P. Walensky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MacDonald Property Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lauren Terkel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, December 13, 2021 | ||
49 | 49
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 12/14 10:08 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to47 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rochelle P. Walensky, Sherri A. Berger, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Norris Cochran, United States of America. IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the appeal is DISMISSED.(wea, ) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Opinion, | ||
Att: 2 USCA Transmittal Letter | ||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
notice
Notice of Availability of Electronic ROA
Mon 03/22 9:36 AM
Original Record on Appeal accepted for 21-40137 Counsel can now access the Electronic Record on Appeal by following the instruction found here: http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf. (mll, ) |
||
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 03/15 8:43 AM
USCA Case Number 21-40137 for47 Notice of Appeal. (mll, ) |
||
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
48 | 48
appeal
Appeal Transcript Request
Fri 03/12 2:07 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sherri A. Berger, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Norris Cochran, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Rochelle P. Walensky (Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Saturday, February 27, 2021 | ||
47 | 47
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Sat 02/27 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to46 Judgment,45 Order, by Sherri A. Berger, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Norris Cochran, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Rochelle P. Walensky. (Myers, Steven) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2021 | ||
46 | 46
order
Judgment
Thu 02/25 4:05 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 2/25/2021. (ndc) |
|
45 | 45
21
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/25 3:34 PM
OPINION AND ORDER dismissing without prejudice the claims of plaintiffs Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd. and Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP for lack of standing; entering summary judgment granting declaratory relief for the remaining plaintiffs; and denying without prejudice any pending motion as moot. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 2/25/2021. (ndc) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
44 | 44
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/22 11:01 AM
NOTICE by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky of Filing of Supplemental Administrative Record(Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification of Supplemental Administrative Record, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Index of Supplemental Administrative Record, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Supplemental Administrative Record - Part 1, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement Supplemental Administrative Record - Part 2 | ||
order
Order
Mon 02/22 4:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER that the clerk of court shall update the docket to reflect the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d) automatic substitutions recited in the government's February 1, 2021 notice. Ordered by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 2/22/2021. (ndc) Modified on 2/22/2021 to correct date. (ndc) |
||
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
order
Order
Wed 02/17 8:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER that defendants shall supplement the administrative record to the CDC Order at issue by noon CST on February 22, 2021, to include any new materials considered or relied upon in issuing the recent, extended order now in effect. Ordered by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 2/17/2021. (ndc) |
||
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/16 6:43 PM
NOTICE by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP re41 Order, Plaintiffs' Brief in Response to the Court's Request for Supplemental Briefing (Henneke, Robert) |
|
42 | 42
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/16 3:39 PM
NOTICE by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky re41 Order, Defendants' Response to the Court's February 12, 2021 Order (Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/12 12:37 PM
ORDER giving leave to file supplemental briefing on summary judgment in light of agency order extension. The briefing is due by 2/16/2021, and is limited to 10 pages for all plaintiffs and 10 pages for all defendants. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 2/12/2021. (ndc) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/01 11:51 AM
NOTICE by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky(Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit January 29, 2021 CDC Order | ||
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
respoth
Response to Non-Motion
Wed 01/06 10:16 AM
RESPONSE to37 Notice (Other), by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP. (Henneke, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 01/05 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Aaron Barnes, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barnes, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, December 31, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 12/31 1:49 PM
NOTICE by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky of Supplemental Authority(Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Injunction Ruling in Chambless Enters., LLC v. Redfield, No. 20-1455 (W.D. La.), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Preliminary Injunction Order in Chambless Enters., LLC v. Redfield, No. 20-1455 (W.D. La.) | ||
Monday, December 28, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 12/28 6:59 PM
NOTICE by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky re30 Order, Defendants' Further Response to the Court's December 16, 2020 Order (Vigen, Leslie) |
|
35 | 35
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/28 6:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky.(Vigen, Leslie) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 12/28 5:10 PM
NOTICE by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP re30 Order, Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to the Court's December 16, 2020 Order (Henneke, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, December 23, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/23 2:04 PM
NOTICE by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky re30 Order, Defendants Response to the Court's December 16, 2020 Order (Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 12/22 1:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER denying32 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time File Answer. Ordered by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 12/22/2020. (ndc) |
||
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 12/21 4:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky.(Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/16 11:49 AM
NOTICE by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky re28 Notice (Other),, of Filing of Appendix to the Administrative Record(Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Recertification of Administrative Record and Updated Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Administrative Record - Part 9 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/16 11:38 AM
ORDER directing the government to file a supplemental brief addressing whether the challenged agency order's expiration will moot this action by 12/23/2020. If the agency order is extended prior to 12/23/2020, the government shall file by 12/23/2020 a notice of the order's extension. Any response by plaintiffs to the government's supplemental brief on impending mootness is due by 12/30/2020. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 12/16/2020. (ndc) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Mon 12/14 7:13 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:28 Notice (Other),,..(Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Administrative Record - Part 6, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Administrative Record - Part 7, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Administrative Record - Part 8 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 12/14 7:08 PM
NOTICE by Alex Azar, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, Nina Witkofsky of Filing of Administrative Record(Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Administrative Record Certification and Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Administrative Record - Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Administrative Record - Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Administrative Record - Part 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Administrative Record - Part 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Administrative Record - Part 5 | ||
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 12/11 11:16 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Complaint, Motion for Preliminary Injunction w/Order, Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits Amended served on Defendants on 10/23/2020, filed by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP. (Henneke, Robert) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 12/10 5:06 PM
ORDER adding United States of America as a defendant. Any disagreement with this addition should be raised by motion filed by 12/14/2020. The scheduling order24 is modified to direct defendants to file the administrative record in this action on or before 12/14/2020. Any related briefing is due as noted herein. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 12/10/2020. (ndc) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 12/07 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Daniel Walters on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Walters, Ryan) |
|
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 12/07 3:50 PM
ORDER for Defendants to file the administrative record for the challenged agency order on the same day that the government files that same administrative record in any other pending litigation. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 12/7/2020. (ndc) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/04 6:47 PM
NOTICE by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Nina Witkofsky re18 Order, Defendants' Memorandum in Response to the Court's November 20, 2020 Order (Vigen, Leslie) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/04 4:56 PM
NOTICE by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP re18 Order, Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of Considering and Granting Declaratory Relief on Summary Judgment (Henneke, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Transcript
Tue 12/01 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11 20-2020 before Judge JC BARKER. Court Reporter/Transcriber: SAZIELIE,Telephone number: 903-590-1065. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 12/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2021. (saz, ) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Transcript/Digital Audio Recording Request
Mon 11/23 1:25 PM
PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP for proceedings held on 11/20/2020 Motion Hearing before Judge J. Campbell Barker. (Henneke, Robert) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Transcript/Digital Audio Recording Request
Mon 11/23 8:45 AM
PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Nina Witkofsky for proceedings held on 11/20/2020 Motion Hearing before Judge J. Campbell Barker. (Forward to Susan Zielie)(Vigen, Leslie) (Main Document 19 replaced on 11/23/2020 with flattened image) (nkl, ). Modified on 11/23/2020 (nkl, ) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 11/20 5:14 PM
ORDER for the parties to provide any information that would counsel against considering or granting summary judgment in response to this notice by 12/4/2020. Any briefing and response is limited to 20 pages. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 11/20/2020. (ndc) |
|
17 | 17
minutes
~Util - Terminate Motions Motion Hearing
Fri 11/20 3:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge J. Campbell Barker: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2020 re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The court granted14 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter Susan Zielie.) (ndc) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 11/18 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chance Dean Weldon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weldon, Chance) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Wed 11/18 10:14 AM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 11/18/2020. (ndc) |
|
utility
Remark
Wed 11/18 10:34 AM
NOTICE providing the public access line (877-336-1839) and access code (6231391) for the hearing on motion3 set for 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. (ndc) |
||
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Expedite
Tue 11/17 3:29 PM
Emergency MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP.(Henneke, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Tue 11/17 11:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Non-Dispositive Motion. The Reply to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction13 is hereby deemed filed nunc pro tunc . Any sur-reply shall not exceed 15 pages, exclusive of exhibits and attachments. Ordered by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 11/17/2020. (ndc) |
||
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 11/16 5:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP . (Henneke, Robert) |
|
12 | 12
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 11/16 5:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP.(Henneke, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/09 7:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Nina Witkofsky .(Vigen, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Order Denying Preliminary Injunction Motion in Tiger Lily v. U.S. Dep't of Housing & Urban Dev., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Order Denying Temporary Restraining Order in KBW Investment Props. LLC v. Azar | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 11/09 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Andrew Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/03 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Leslie Cooper Vigen on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee waived. (saenz, ) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 11/03 9:43 AM
***DEFICIENT FILING. TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY AS A PRO HAC VICE.*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie Cooper Vigen on behalf of All Defendants (Vigen, Leslie) Modified on 11/3/2020 (gsg) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 11/03 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Notice of Appearance, Docket Entry8 . Incorrect Docketing Event. To be refiled by attorney as a Pro Hav Vice. Correction should be made by 1 Business Day. (gsg) |
||
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 10/28 11:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Complaint, Motion for Preliminary Injunction w/Order, Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits served on All Defendants on October 23, 2020, filed by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP.(Henneke, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/23 10:27 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Alex Azar, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, United States Department of Health and Human Services, and Nina Witkofsky.(ndc) |
|
Att: 1 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 2 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 3 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 4 Summons(es) | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/23 7:37 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly S Hermann on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8069561. (Hermann, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/23 7:34 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Celia Howard O'Leary on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8069556. (O'Leary, Celia) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 10/23 8:18 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (mll, ) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 10/23 5:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Non-Dispositive Motion. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support3 is hereby deemed filed nunc pro tunc . Any response thereto shall not exceed 30 pages, exclusive of exhibits and attachments. Ordered by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 10/23/2020. (ndc) |
||
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Thu 10/22 8:18 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP.(Henneke, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
motion
File Excess Pages
Thu 10/22 8:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Non-Dispositive Motion by Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP.(Henneke, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/22 8:07 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8069083.), filed by Lauren Terkel, Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, LP, Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Ltd., Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Ltd., MacDonald Property Management, LLC, Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Ltd., Lakeridge Apartments, Ltd..(Henneke, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 10/23 8:16 AM
District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, ) |
||
utility
Remark
Fri 10/23 8:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, ) |