Quintana v. Quintana
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Roy B Dalton, Jr |
Referred: | Leslie R Hoffman |
Case #: | 6:20-cv-02016 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 42:11601 International Child Abduction Remedies Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 30, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 28, 2021 4:48 AM EDT |
Petitioner
Ms. Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quintana
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Mr. Leonel Alberto Jose Quintana
601 Rancha Lane Apt. H.
Kissimmee, FL 34741 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Thu 03/04 12:00 PM
ORDER dismissing case re 19 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk isdirected to terminate all pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/4/2021. (BIA) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of voluntary dismissal
Mon 03/01 9:49 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quintana (Edens, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Wed 02/03 4:20 PM
STIPULATION by Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quintana. (Edens, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Response to order to show cause
Thu 01/28 7:38 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re16 Order to show cause filed by Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quintana. (Edens, Thomas) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Fri 01/22 10:11 AM
ORDER: By Thursday, January 28, 2021 Petitioner and Respondent (if he appears) are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written response why this action should not be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida--or if they agree to transfer. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/22/2021. (BIA) (ctp) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Brief - Plaintiff
Thu 01/21 11:12 AM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re14 Brief - Defendant filed by Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quintana.(Edens, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Sunbiz Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Verified Return of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Brief - Defendant
Tue 01/19 9:41 AM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF re13 Order pdf, Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC filed by Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quintana. (Edens, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Wed 01/06 10:29 AM
Set deadlines: Status Report due by 1/19/2021. (KNC) |
||
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
order
*Order pdf
Tue 01/05 4:26 PM
ORDER: By Tuesday, January 19, 2021 Petitioner is DIRECTED to file a status report updating the Court on the current efforts to locate the children and Respondent. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/5/2021. (BIA) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/24 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Filing Letter to the Court by United States Department of State. (BIA) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 11/10 10:54 AM
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/10/2020. (MDH) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice canceling hearing
Mon 11/09 4:25 PM
NOTICE canceling Show Cause hearing scheduled for 11/13/2020 in light of8 US Marshal 285 form for Service. (BIA) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 11/09 4:10 PM
Second MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quintana. (Edens, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
service
US Marshal form 285
Fri 11/06 8:16 AM
US Marshal 285 form for Service of4 Order to Show Cause on Leonel Alberto Jose Quintana. Unable to locate/serve. See Remarks for details. (KNC) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 11/04 10:47 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 6 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/4/2020. (MDH) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 11/03 4:11 PM
First MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quintana. (Edens, Thomas) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Response to order to show cause
Tue 11/03 1:54 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quintana.(Edens, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consenual Divorce, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Request to Return, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Birth Certificates, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Photographs, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Order of Judge Canela, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Travel Authorization, | ||
Att: 7 Main Document Redacted Petition, | ||
Att: 8 Supplement Redacted Informa Pauperis | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Tue 11/03 8:38 AM
ORDER to show cause as to Leonel Alberto Jose Quintana. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/2/2020. (BIA) (ctp) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
order
*Order pdf
Mon 11/02 8:24 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal Petitioner's Petition for Return of Child to Petitioner (Doc. 1) and Exhibits (Docs. 1-1 to 1-8). By Wednesday, November 4, 2020, Petitioner is DIRECTED to file redacted versions of the Petition and Exhibits that remove all personal identifying information consistent with this Order. Upon receipt of the redacted versions, the Clerk is DIRECTED to strike the sealed documents (Docs. 1, 1-1 to 1-8) and remove them from the public docket. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/31/2020. (BIA) (ctp) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/30 3:44 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-2016-Orl-37LRH. (SJB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/30 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Leonel Alberto Jose Quintana filed by Karoline Virginia Miranda Machado Quitana.(Onatsko, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Informa Paupris, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Consenual Divorce, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Request to Return, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Birth Certificates, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Photographs, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Judge Canela Order, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Travel Order, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |