State of New York v. Walsh
Original Case: 1:20-cv-01689
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03806 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 01, 2021 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Martin J. Walsh, Secretary of the United States Department of Labor
|
Represented By
Natasha Waglow Teleanu
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New contact info |
Defendant - Appellant
United States of America
|
Represented By
Natasha Waglow Teleanu
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New contact info |
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of Labor
|
Represented By
Natasha Waglow Teleanu
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New contact info |
Defendant - Appellant
Eugene Scalia, Esq., Secretary of the United States Department of Labor
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellant
American Lodging and Hotel Association
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellant
Associated Builders and Contractors
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellant
National Retail Federation
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellant
HR Policy Association
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellant
The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellant
International Franchise Association
|
Represented By
|
Movant
National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Restaurant Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Washington Legal Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Vermont
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Michigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Commonwealth of Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Washington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Rhode Island
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New Mexico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
District of Columbia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of California
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/01/2021 4:27 AM EDT |
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Eugene Scalia, Esq., United States Department of Labor and United States of America, FILED. [2971007] 20-3806 [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:20 PM] | |
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2971019] 20-3806 [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:26 PM] | |
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
7 | 7 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant American Lodging and Hotel Association, Associated Builders and Contractors, HR Policy Association, International Franchise Association, National Retail Federation and The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 20-3815 FILED. [2971701] 20-3815 20-3806 [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:09 PM] | |
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |