Tangtiwatanapaibul v. Tom & Toon Inc
Original Case: 1:17-cv-00816
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03852 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 13, 2022 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant
Douglas Kai Wing Chiu
|
|
Defendant
David J. Louie
|
|
Defendant
Peter Fong Chiu
|
|
Defendant
Toon Lau
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thai Toon At Grand Central, Inc., DBA Thai Toon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thai Toon at Grand Central, Inc., DBA Thai Toon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Roongkant Preechatammarach, AKA Toon Lau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wai Ying Lau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Silom Thai Inc, DBA Silom Thai
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Toon Thai Inc, DBA Noodle Den
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thai Sliders & Co. LLC, DBA Thai Sliders
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tom & Toon Inc, DBA Broadway Thai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Beltran
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Manoon Charussilapa, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, AKA Charlie Charussilapa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Phouviengsone Sysouvong, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, Tukta Phouviengsone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Phouviengkhone Thammavong, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Phouviengsone Sysouvong, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, AKA Tukta Phouviengsone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Srisuwan Tangtiwatanapaibul, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, AKA Anne Tangtiwatanapaibul
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/13/2022 3:30 AM EST |
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Manoon Charussilapa, Phouviengsone Sysouvong, Srisuwan Tangtiwatanapaibul and Phouviengkhone Thammavong, FILED. [2974557] 20-3852 [Entered: 11/13/2020 06:12 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 31 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 10/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2974558] 20-3852 [Entered: 11/13/2020 06:15 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2974560] 20-3852 [Entered: 11/13/2020 06:15 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 30 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |