Bromfield-Thompson v. American University of Antigua
Original Case: 1:19-cv-06078
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03855 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 25, 2021 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
American University of Antigua/Manipal Education Americas, LLC, AKA GCLR, LLC
|
|
Defendant
NBME
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NBME
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
American University of Antigua
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Manipal Education Americas, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Debbie Ann Bromfield-Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/25/2021 4:28 AM EDT |
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Debbie Ann Bromfield-Thompson, FILED. [2975092] 20-3855 [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:45 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 14 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2975094] 20-3855 [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:49 PM] | |
3 | 3 12 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2975098] 20-3855 [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:51 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2975099] 20-3855 [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:52 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |