Petroleos De Venezuela S.A. v. MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Original Case: 1:19-cv-10023
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03858 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 18, 2020 3:25 AM EST |
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
GLAS Americas LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
PDV Holding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
PDVSA Petroleo S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A. and Petroleos De Venezuela S.A., FILED. [2975210] 20-3858 [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:15 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 40 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 68 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/16/2020, RECEIVED.[2975214] 20-3858 [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:18 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A. and Petroleos De Venezuela S.A., district court receipt # ANYSDC-22558483, FILED.[2975217] 20-3858 [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:19 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2975223] 20-3858 [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:22 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 39 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |