Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Guerrera
Original Case: 3:17-cv-00621
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03853 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 27, 2022 4:32 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae
American Property Casualty Insurance Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
MARC Coalition
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
New York Insurance Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
DRI, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
America's Health Insurance Plans
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
MSP Recovery, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nellina Guerrera
|
|
Defendant
Carter Mario Law Firm
|
|
Defendant
Sean Hammil
|
|
Defendant
Danielle Wisniowski
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Big Y Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Aetna Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 26 2022
OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, by RSP, RDS, WJN concurring, FILED.[3407797] [20-3853] |
|
GPO
Oct 26 2022
OPINION, Concurring, by WJN, FILED.[3407802] [20-3853] |
Docket last updated: 10/27/2022 4:30 AM EDT |
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Big Y Foods, Inc., FILED. [2974842] 20-3853 [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:15 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 23 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/05/2020, RECEIVED.[2974891] 20-3853 [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:49 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/19/2020, RECEIVED.[2974897] 20-3853 [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:53 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2974974] 20-3853 [Entered: 11/16/2020 11:35 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Big Y Foods, Inc., district court receipt # ACTDC6217634, FILED.[2975010] 20-3853 [Entered: 11/16/2020 11:58 AM] |