Cambridge Valley Machining, In v. Hudson MFG LLC
Original Case: 1:18-cv-01022
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03885 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2021 5:48 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellant
Hudson Standard LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
Hudson MFG LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
Billie Hudson, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
Lauren Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
Cambridge Valley Machining, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/04/2021 4:25 AM EST |
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Billie Hudson, III, Lauren Hudson, Hudson MFG LLC and Hudson Standard LLC, FILED. [2977021] 20-3885 [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:47 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 15 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM, DECISION AND ORDER, dated 07/02/2020, RECEIVED.[2977029] 20-3885 [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:53 AM] | |
3 | 3 8 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM, DECISION AND ORDER, dated 10/02/2020, RECEIVED.[2977033] 20-3885 [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:55 AM] | |
4 | 4 15 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM, DECISION AND ORDER, dated 10/14/2020, RECEIVED.[2977039] 20-3885 [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:57 AM] | |
5 | 5 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/14/2020, RECEIVED.[2977043] 20-3885 [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:58 AM] | |
6 | 6 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Billie Hudson, III, Lauren Hudson, Hudson MFG LLC and Hudson Standard LLC, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5315879, FILED.[2977047] 20-3885 [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:59 AM] | |
7 | 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2977051] 20-3885 [Entered: 11/18/2020 11:01 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |