Stephen T. Greenberg, M.D., P. v. Perfect Body Image, LLC
Original Case: 2:17-cv-05807
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03912 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 01, 2022 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellant
Perfect Body Image, LLC, DBA Perfect Body Laser and Aesthetics
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
John Doe 1-5
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Stephen T. Greenberg, M.D., P.C., DBA Greenberg Cosmetic Surgery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Stephen T. Greenberg, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/01/2022 3:30 AM EST |
Thursday, November 19, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John Doe 1-5 and Perfect Body Image, LLC, FILED. [2978859] 20-3912 [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:42 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 9 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/20/2020, RECEIVED.[2978878] 20-3912 [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:51 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant John Doe 1-5 and Perfect Body Image, LLC, district court receipt # ANYEDC-13712183, FILED.[2978883] 20-3912 [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:53 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2978889] 20-3912 [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:55 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |