Rizzi v. Park Hotels and Resorts, Inc.
Original Case: 2:18-cv-01127
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03926 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2021 6:13 AM EST |
Defendant
Park Hotels and Resorts, INC., DBA Hilton Worldwide, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Albert Rizzi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/04/2021 4:30 AM EST |
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Albert Rizzi, FILED. [2979523] 20-3926 [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:51 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 8 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/23/2020, RECEIVED.[2979525] 20-3926 [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:54 PM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/26/2020, RECEIVED.[2979526] 20-3926 [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:54 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Albert Rizzi, district court receipt # ANYEDC-13717596, FILED.[2979527] 20-3926 [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:55 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2979528] 20-3926 [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:56 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |