Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:20-bk-35740
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2020
Plan Confirmed:May 14, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Seadrill Partners LLC

,
Represented By
Matthew D Cavenaugh
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Stephen Douglas Statham
Office Of Us Trustee
contact info


1. Seadrill Partners Emerges from Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (oedigital.com)
Submitted Tue 05/25/2021
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Thursday, June 17, 2021
607 607 misc Affidavit Thu 06/17 7:58 PM
Affidavit Re: Mailings for the Period from June 6, 2021 through June 12, 2021 . Related [+]. Filed by Prime Clerk LLC(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 597 Notice,598 Notice,599 Notice,600 Application for Compensation,603 Generic Order,604 Application for Compensation
Att: 1 Affidavit of June 7
Att: 2 Affidavit of June 8
Att: 3 Affidavit of June 8
Att: 4 Affidavit of June 9
Att: 5 Affidavit of June 10
606 606 misc Certificate of No Objection (Complex 11 ONLY) Thu 06/17 10:30 AM
Certificate of No Objection with Respect to the First Interim Fee Application of Evercore Group LLC and Evercore Partners International LLP, Investment Banker to the Debtors, for Allowance and Payment of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from December 1, 2020 through and including February 28, 2021 (Filed By Seadrill Partners LLC ) Related [+] (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-] 579 Application for Compensation
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
605 605 notice Notice Tue 06/15 12:52 PM
Notice of Fee Statement of KPMG LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to Provide Tax Provision and Consulting Services for the Period from March 1, 2021 Through May 14, 2021 . Filed by Seadrill Partners LLC (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
604 604 motion Compensation Thu 06/10 4:22 PM
Application for Compensation First Interim Application of Ernst & Young LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period From December 15, 2020 Through February 28, 2021 . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Attorney Matthew D Cavenaugh (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
602 602 misc Affidavit Thu 06/10 10:30 AM
Affidavit Re: Mailings for the Period from May 30, 2021 through June 5, 2021 . Related [+]. Filed by Prime Clerk LLC(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 591 Notice,592 Emergency Motion,593 Notice,594 Notice
Att: 1 Affidavit of June 2
Att: 2 Affidavit of June 3