Seadrill US Gulf LLC Jointly Administered under 20-35740.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-35740
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-35740
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:20-bk-35758 |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Seadrill US Gulf LLC
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Thu 03/28 9:59 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing that all further reporting concerning the administration of the assets and liabilities in this case will occur only in the case of Seadrill Operating GP LLC, Case No. 20-35760 The docket in Case No. 20- 35760 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
Thursday, June 24, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/24 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/24/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 08, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
order
Final Decree (No Form)
Mon 06/21 8:25 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 6/8/2021 (emiller) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 12/04 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
order
Joint Administration
Fri 12/04 9:26 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 20-35740 Signed on 12/4/2020 (aaloadi) |
|
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Fri 12/04 9:26 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-35740 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) |
||
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
court
No Creditor Mailing List
Wed 12/02 11:38 AM
No Creditor Mailing List (JacquelineMataadi) |
|
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Wed 12/02 6:00 AM
|
||
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Tue 12/01 1:56 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Seadrill US Gulf LLC. (Graham, Genevieve) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 12/01 2:08 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-35758 [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22634783. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |