USA v. $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Jay A Garcia-Gregory |
Referred: | Camille L Velez-Rive |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-01461 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 28:1341 Complaint for Forfeiture |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 10:50 PM AST |
Claimant
Felipe Melendez-Ben
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
$18,000.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
|
|
Defendant
$18,000.00 in U.S. Currency
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
service
USM Return
Wed 08/12 11:54 AM
USM Return of Complaint, Order, Warrant & Notice Unexecuted as to Luis J. Lopez-Febres on 3/6/15 (ab) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
service
USM Return
Thu 07/23 5:35 PM
USM Return of Default Judgment Unexecuted as to Felipe Melendez-Ben on 6/25/15 (su) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Informative Motion Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 07/15 6:20 PM
ORDER noted and moot27 INFORMATIVE motion; denying28 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court notes that claimant had failed to make an appearance before this Court since December 29, 2014. Despite asking for an extension of time then to respond to the Government's Interrogatories, claimant failed to file any motions or notify the Court of any relevant information as to why he failed to answer the interrogatories. Instead, claimant decided to ignore this Court's orders and, after seven months of traveling abroad for "shows and spectacles," appeared asking this Court to set aside the entry of default judgment. The Court refuses to do so. The Motion is denied. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/15/2015. (CLM) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 07/06 3:49 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration and Vacating re25 Default Judgment filed by Luis R. Rivera-Rodriguez on behalf of $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Felipe Melendez-Ben Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/23/2015 (Rivera-Rodriguez, Luis) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Informative Motion
Mon 07/06 3:45 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Interrogatories filed by Luis R. Rivera-Rodriguez on behalf of $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Felipe Melendez-Ben Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/23/2015 (Rivera-Rodriguez, Luis) |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
service
USM Return
Wed 06/17 5:37 PM
USM Return of Complaint, Order and Warrant Executed as to Luis Lopez-Febres on on 3/6/15 (su) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment - Default
Fri 06/12 2:40 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/12/2015.(CLM) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 06/12 2:35 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Default Judgment. Default Judgment shall be entered in a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/12/2015. (CLM) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Default -Judgment
Tue 06/09 1:13 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/26/2015(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 06/04 4:10 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency. (su) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Strike
Thu 06/04 3:06 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot14 Motion to Strike ; granting20 Motion to Strike and Motion for entry of Default. The Court hereby orders7 Answer to be stricken from the record and for default to be entered against Defendant. The Clerk shall take notice. Motion for default judgement and the proposed text for default judgment must be filed by 6/12/2015. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/4/2015. (CLM) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Strike
Thu 03/19 1:20 PM
MOTION to Strike Claim and Answer to the Complaint Re:7 Answer to Complaint filed by $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/6/2015 (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, February 23, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
service
USM Return
Wed 02/25 3:49 PM
USM Return of Complaint, Order, Warrant & Notice Executed as to Felipe Melendez-Ben on 09/17/2014. (cm) |
|
Tuesday, December 30, 2014 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 12/30 1:29 PM
ORDER: granting Docket No.17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Special Interrogatories. Answers due January 22, 2015. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on December 30, 2014. (ASE) |
|
Monday, December 29, 2014 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 12/29 2:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/22/2015 to File Answer to Government's First Set of Special Interrogatories filed by Luis R. Rivera-Rodriguez on behalf of $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/15/2015 (Rivera-Rodriguez, Luis) |
|
Monday, September 29, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Strike Answer to the Complaint for Lack of Standing and for Default Judgment filed by $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency Re:14 MOTION to Strike Answer to the Complaint for Lack of Standing and for Default Judgment Re:7 Answer to Complaint filed by $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency filed by USA filed by $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency.(Rivera-Rodriguez, Luis) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
15 | 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/29/2014. (ljt) | |
Thursday, September 11, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 MOTION to Strike Answer to the Complaint for Lack of Standing and for Default Judgment Re:7 Answer to Complaint filed by $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/29/2014 (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) | |
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 USM Return of Complaint, Order, Warrant & Notice Executed as to Luis J. Lopez-Febres via attorney Luis Rafael-Rivera on 7/15/2014. (cm) | |
12 | 12 USM Return of Complaint, Order, Warrant & Notice Executed as to Felipe Melendez-Ben via attorney Luis Rafael-Rivera on 7/15/2014. (cm) | |
11 | 11 USM Return of Complaint, Order, Warrant & Notice Executed as to USMS on 7/22/2014. (cm) | |
Monday, August 18, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER, Set Hearings - Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 9/29/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 8/18/14.(ljt) | |
9 | 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the8 Order Referring Case entered by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 08/18/2014, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive to conduct an Initial Scheduling Conference within 30 days from the date of entry of said Order. Signed by Clerk on 08/18/2014.(gr) | |
8 | 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Velez-Rive for an ISC. The Court hereby sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 6/22/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 6/15/2015 03:00 PM before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Joint Pretrial Memorandum due by 6/8/2015. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/18/2014.(RJC) | |
Thursday, August 14, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Luis R. Rivera-Rodriguez on behalf of Defendant $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency.(Rivera-Rodriguez, Luis) | |
Tuesday, July 29, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Publication by USA (Lomba-Ortiz, Eugenio) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, June 23, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Warrant of Arrest in REM Issued as to $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency. (rc) | |
Friday, June 20, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER granting2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/20/2014. (RJC) | |
Wednesday, June 11, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (jla) | |
Tuesday, June 10, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Seizure filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/27/2014(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $18,000.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, filed by USA. Service due by 10/14/2014,(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) | |
Att: 1 Unsworn Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Sheet |