Arish Ahmad Khan et al v. Robyn Rihanna Fenty et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-11555 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 20, 2021 2:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Robyn Rihanna Fenty
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Arish Ahmad Khan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 06/17 12:07 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing). (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 04/28 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Arish Ahmad Khan, Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Monday, March 29, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Settlement
Mon 03/29 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulated Request to Extend Defendant's Response Deadline filed by Plaintiffs Arish Ahmad Khan, Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan.(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 03/29 2:39 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CASE DUE TO SETTLEMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court has been advised that this action has been settled. Accordingly, it is ordered that the action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction for 60 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action on a showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed and further proceedings are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 03/22 3:08 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robyn Rihanna Fenty answer now due 3/31/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Arish Ahmad Khan; Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan.(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 03/15 10:08 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robyn Rihanna Fenty answer now due 3/22/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Arish Ahmad Khan; Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan.(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 02/23 12:52 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robyn Rihanna Fenty answer now due 3/15/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Arish Ahmad Khan; Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan.(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Thursday, December 31, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/31 1:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Arish Ahmad Khan, Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan. upon Robyn Rihanna Fenty waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Jordan W. Siev, Attorney for Defendant. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Monday, December 28, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 12/28 3:48 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 12/28 1:20 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Robyn Rihanna Fenty. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 12/28 1:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 12/28 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Tue 12/22 1:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Arish Ahmad Khan, Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Tue 12/22 1:10 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Arish Ahmad Khan, Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 12/22 1:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Arish Ahmad Khan, Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 12/22 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Arish Ahmad Khan, Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan, (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 12/22 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29660252 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Arish Ahmad Khan, Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Arish Ahmad Khan(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Sabaa Louise Ahmad Khan(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) |