New York Southern District Court
Judge:John P Cronan
Case #: 1:21-cv-00010
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332ct Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 04, 2021 12:12 PM EST
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A
Represented By
Gregory Blase
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Billy Dixon
505 W 37th St. Apt 2108
New York, NY 10018


Docket last updated: 01/19/2021 11:59 PM EST
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/19 4:14 PM
MOTION for Andrew C. Glass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23581264. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Glass, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Andrew C. Glass,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 01/19 4:16 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for Andrew C. Glass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23581264. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Wed 01/13 4:08 PM
ORDER granting10 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Notice of Removal,6 Notice of Removal, to address Wells Fargo's request for pre-motion conference to discuss bases for motion to compel arbitration or alternatively to dismiss addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Gregory N. Blase dated January 11, 2021. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference is GRANTED. All parties shall be prepared to discuss Defendant's anticipated motion to compel arbitration, or alternatively, to dismiss, at the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 11, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of this memo endorsement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/13/2021) (rjm)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 01/13 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned for all purposes. All parties must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, including the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Pro Se Litigants (that is, litigants without counsel), which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. All parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on February 11, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Any party that is proceeding in this case pro se is required to appear at this conference. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261, and as further set forth in this Order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan,) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/13/2021) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
13 13 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Wed 01/13 11:13 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: B. Dixon consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Billy Dixon.(sc)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/12 5:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Tue 01/12 5:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Gregory Blase to RE-FILE Document 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
11 11 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 01/11 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion to Request Conference re: Motion to Compel Arbitration or Alternatively to Dismiss served on Billy Dixon on January 11, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Conference Mon 01/11 4:28 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Notice of Removal,6 Notice of Removal, to address Wells Fargo's request for pre-motion conference to discuss bases for motion to compel arbitration or alternatively to dismiss addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Gregory N. Blase dated January 11, 2021. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
8 8 service Certificate of Service Other Tue 01/05 3:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on Billy Dixon on 1/5/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/05 3:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Removal Tue 01/05 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 160028/2020..Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Summons),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (CSC Cover Sheet),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Notice of E-Filing)
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 01/05 11:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory Blase to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/05 11:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gregory Blase to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the second page of the PDF was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 01/05 11:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Blase. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $100,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $100,000;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 01/05 11:58 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Case No Longer Designated ECF Tue 01/05 12:00 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] ., Case No Longer Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 01/05 12:00 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/04 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Priya Chadha on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Chadha, Priya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
4 4 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 01/04 11:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of removal, civil cover sheet, corporate disclosure statement, and certificate of service served on Billy Dixon on 1/4/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/04 11:55 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/04 11:52 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/04 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court for New York County, County of New York. Case Number: 160028/2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23330802).Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Blase, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit 1