Dodgen v. AARP
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrea R Wood |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00086 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 05, 2021 5:16 AM CDT |
Defendant
AARP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurinda Dodgen
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 30 2022
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/30/2022. Mailed notice (lma, ) |
Docket last updated: 08/16/2021 10:30 AM CDT |