In Re: Application of Union Bank of India (UK) ltd. for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Referred: | Barbara C Moses |
Case #: | 1:21-mc-00005 |
Cause | M 77 Application to have subpoena issued to person living in this district re: action in foreign cou |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 07, 2021 2:30 PM EST |
Applicant
Union Bank of India (UK) Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Mon 01/25 5:00 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Discovery. It is therefore ORDERED that (1) the Application is GRANTED; (2) Applicant is authorized to serve a subpoena substantially in the form attached as Exhibit 1 to the January 6, 2021 Declaration of David E. Potter upon Respondent; as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/25/2021) (cf) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/21 1:36 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute. Petition for an order to take discovery for use in foreign proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 and any related issues. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. Motions referred to Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/21/2021) (kv) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 01/20 10:10 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (ad) |
||
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
notice
Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 01/08 11:06 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(vba) |
||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Fri 01/08 4:12 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 7 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) |
||
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 01/07 12:16 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Union Bank of India (UK) Ltd.. Related Document Number:1 ..(Potter, David) |
|
6 | 6
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 01/07 12:15 PM
DECLARATION of David Potter in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery . (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23397826). Document filed by Union Bank of India (UK) Ltd...(Potter, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena | ||
5 | 5
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 01/07 12:13 PM
DECLARATION of Vivekanand Jaganathan in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery . (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23397826). Document filed by Union Bank of India (UK) Ltd...(Potter, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Claim, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Application, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Amended Claim, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Particulars of Claim, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Facility Agreement | ||
4 | 4
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 01/07 12:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery . (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23397826) . Document filed by Union Bank of India (UK) Ltd...(Potter, David) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/07 12:06 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Union Bank of India (UK) Ltd...(Potter, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Miscellaneous Cover Sheet
Thu 01/07 12:04 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Potter, David) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Discovery
Thu 01/07 12:03 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery . (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23397826)Document filed by Union Bank of India (UK) Ltd..(Potter, David) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 01/07 3:57 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba) |