New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Case #: 1:21-cv-00157
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2021
Terminated:Jan 08, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2021 1:10 AM EST
Defendant
J. Biden
Defendant
City of NY (HRA)
Defendant
Court of Appeals
Defendant
A. Cuomo
Defendant
Doug Korneski
Defendant
Rick Lande
Defendant
Memphis Police Department
Defendant
N.Y.P.D.
Defendant
NYC Anti Social Club
Defendant
NYC MTA
Defendant
NYCT
Defendant
David Rauch
Defendant
The White House
Defendant
Trinidad Government
Defendant
Trinidad US Consulate
Defendant
Donald Trump
Defendant
US Congress
Defendant
US Government
Defendant
US SD Court
Defendant
US Senate
Defendant
US Supreme Court
Plaintiff
Yvonne Frost
40 Ann Street
New York, NY 10038


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, January 08, 2021
5 5 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 01/08 4:56 PM
ORDER: The Court denies Plaintiff leave to file this action because she fails to show that her claims are not frivolous. See Frost v. NYPD, ECF 1:20-CV-0417, 5 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 14, 2020) Related [+]. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate any pending motions and close this action. Plaintiff has consented to electronic service of Court documents. (ECF No. 4.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/8/2021) (sac)
Related: [-] quiring Plaintiff to submit with any new complaint: a motion for leave to file; a copy of the February 14, 2020 order; the relevant fees or IFP application; and a statement, made under penalty of perjury, stating that the claims are not frivolous or in bad faith, that the lawsuit is not brought for any improper purpose, such as to harass or cause unnecessary delay, and that the filing complies with this Court's orders, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and this Courts Local Rules
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Fri 01/08 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
4 4 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Fri 01/08 1:16 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Yvonne Frost consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Yvonne Frost. (sac)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Leave to File Document Fri 01/08 1:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Complaint. Document filed by Yvonne Frost. (sac)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 01/08 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT against J. Biden, City of NY (HRA), Court of Appeals, A. Cuomo, Doug Korneski, Rick Lande, Memphis Police Department, N.Y.P.D., NYC Anti Social Club, NYC MTA, NYCT, David Rauch, The White House, Trinidad Government, Trinidad US Consulate, Donald Trump, US Congress, US Government, US SD Court, US Senate, US Supreme Court. Document filed by Yvonne Frost. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/08 1:01 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Yvonne Frost.(sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 01/08 1:09 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]