Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 3:21-bk-30037
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tea Olive I, LLC
2600 Eagan Woods Drive, Suite 120
Eagan, MN 55121
Represented By
Clinton E. Cutler
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415

Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
83 83 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 01/26 8:50 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by DONLIN RECANO & COMPANY INC. (Donlin, Recano & Company Inc)
Related: [-] 55 Order on miscellaneous motion (first day motion)
82 82 aplcn MNB Application to employ professional Tue 01/26 2:38 PM
Application to employ Bassford Remele, P.A. as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Supporting affidavit or verified statement of professional person, Proof of service, Proposed order. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
81 81 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (court only) Tue 01/26 8:58 AM
Notice of Hearing and Motion for Order Approving Key Employee Retention Plan and Key Employee Incentive Plan filed by Tea Olive I, LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 2/16/2021 at 10:00 AM at *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-]
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Tue 01/26 2:15 PM
List of Creditors load 42 creditors added (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
trustee MNB US Trustee report in favor of employment Tue 01/26 4:04 PM
Notice of US Trustee report in favor of82 Application to employ professional. (Wencil, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
80 80 court MNB Notice of claim filed by debtor or trustee Mon 01/25 4:35 PM
Notice of claim filed by Debtor on behalf of DEEZ CUTZ LLC. Claim number: 63. Claim amount: $2432.5 (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
79 79 motion MNB Amended motion Mon 01/25 4:03 PM
Amended Motion re:78 Motion to assume/reject/assign filed by Debtor 1 Tea Olive I, LLC. An affidavit or verification, Proposed order. (Andre, Samuel)
Related: [-]
78 78 motion MNB Motion to assume/reject/assign Mon 01/25 3:25 PM
Motion to reject lease filed by Debtor 1 Tea Olive I, LLC. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 2/11/2021 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Andre, Samuel)
Related: [-]
77 77 misc MNB Certificate of service Mon 01/25 8:08 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by DONLIN RECANO & COMPANY INC. (Donlin, Recano & Company Inc)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for use of cash collateral,53 Order on motion for use of cash collateral (preliminary and final)
trustee MNB US Trustee report in favor of employment Mon 01/25 8:08 AM
Notice of US Trustee report in favor of72 Application to employ professional. (Wencil, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 24, 2021
76 76 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/24 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/24/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
75 75 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 01/22 7:45 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Greta M Brouphy. (Brouphy, Greta)
Related: [-]
74 74 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 01/22 7:44 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Leslie A Collins. (Collins, Leslie)
Related: [-]
73 73 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 01/22 7:43 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Douglas S Draper. (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-]
72 72 aplcn MNB Application to employ professional Fri 01/22 7:42 PM
Application to employ Heller, Draper & Horn, L.L.C. as Counsel filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Supporting affidavit or verified statement of professional person, Proof of service, Proposed order. (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-]
71 71 aplcn MNB Application for admission pro hac vice - (FILE TO BKY CASE ONLY) (fee) Fri 01/22 10:32 AM
Application for admission pro hac vice of Leslie A. Collins filed by Jeffrey D. Klobucar for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Fee Amount $100, (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
70 70 aplcn MNB Application for admission pro hac vice - (FILE TO BKY CASE ONLY) (fee) Fri 01/22 10:30 AM
Application for admission pro hac vice of Greta M. Brouphy filed by Jeffrey D. Klobucar for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Fee Amount $100, (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
69 69 aplcn MNB Application for admission pro hac vice - (FILE TO BKY CASE ONLY) (fee) Fri 01/22 10:28 AM
Application for admission pro hac vice of Douglas S. Draper filed by Jeffrey D. Klobucar for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Fee Amount $100, (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
68 68 misc MNB Affidavit (Individual, not service) Fri 01/22 9:30 AM
Affidavit Related [+] filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. (Bodas, Margie)
Related: [-] 64 Motion to vacate
67 67 order MNB Amend application - aplcn Fri 01/22 7:56 AM
Order Granting Amended application Related [+] (WJF) (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-] 65
crditcrd none Fri 01/22 10:29 AM
Receipt of Application for admission pro hac vice 21-30037 [aplcn,admphv] ( 100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12009671. Fee amount 100.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 01/22 10:31 AM
Receipt of Application for admission pro hac vice 21-30037 [aplcn,admphv] ( 100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12009676. Fee amount 100.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 01/22 10:33 AM
Receipt of Application for admission pro hac vice 21-30037 [aplcn,admphv] ( 100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12009680. Fee amount 100.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
order MNB Order granting application for admission pro hac vice - aplcn Fri 01/22 11:37 AM
Order of Bankruptcy Judge William J. Fisher Granting Application for admission pro hac vice of Douglas S Draper Related [+]. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-] 69
order MNB Order granting application for admission pro hac vice - aplcn Fri 01/22 11:39 AM
Order of Bankruptcy Judge William J. Fisher Granting Application for admission pro hac vice of Greta M Brouphy Related [+]. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-] 70
order MNB Order granting application for admission pro hac vice - aplcn Fri 01/22 11:41 AM
Order of Bankruptcy Judge William J. Fisher Granting Application for admission pro hac vice of Leslie A Collins Related [+]. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-] 71
Thursday, January 21, 2021
66 66 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 01/21 7:55 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Jeffrey D. Klobucar. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
65 65 aplcn MNB Amended application Thu 01/21 3:50 PM
Amended application Related [+] filed by Tea Olive I, LLC. (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-] 63 Application to extend time to file schedules.
64 64 motion MNB Motion to vacate Thu 01/21 12:43 PM
Motion to vacate Related [+] filed by American Electric Power, COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY, Constellation NewEnergy, Symmetry Energy Solutions. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 2/4/2021 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Bodas, Margie)
Related: [-] 51 Order on miscellaneous motion (first day motion)
63 63 aplcn MNB Application to extend time to file schedules Thu 01/21 10:43 AM
Application to extend time to file schedules filed by Tea Olive I, LLC. An affidavit or verification, Proposed order. (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
62 62 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 01/20 4:26 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY, American Electric Power, Symmetry Energy Solutions, Constellation NewEnergy and Margie R Bodas. Proof of service. (Bodas, Margie)
Related: [-]
61 61 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 01/20 10:09 AM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Feradyne Outdoors, LLC and Ian M. Rubenstrunk. (Rubenstrunk, Ian)
Related: [-]
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Wed 01/20 4:02 PM
Added creditor to matrix. Creditor(s) added to the case: Constellation NewEnergy, Inc.. (Bodas, Margie)
Related: [-]
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Wed 01/20 4:04 PM
Added creditor to matrix. Creditor(s) added to the case: Symmetry Energy Solutions. (Bodas, Margie)
Related: [-]
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Wed 01/20 4:05 PM
Added creditor to matrix. Creditor(s) added to the case: American Electric Power. (Bodas, Margie)
Related: [-]
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Wed 01/20 4:07 PM
Added creditor to matrix. Creditor(s) added to the case: Commonwealth Edison Company. (Bodas, Margie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
60 60 aplcn MNB Amended application Tue 01/19 3:23 PM
Amended application Related [+] filed by Tea Olive I, LLC. (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-] 5 Application to employ professional
59 59 2 pgs trustee MNB Notice of appointment of creditors committee Tue 01/19 2:51 PM
Notice of appointment of creditors committee. Kimberly Troast, and Lyena Hale, and Scott Guilleaume, and Preston Waller appointed. (Williams-UST, Audrey)
Related: [-]
58 58 aplcn MNB Amended application Tue 01/19 1:39 PM
Amended application Related [+] filed by Tea Olive I, LLC. (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-] 6 Application to employ professional
57 57 aplcn MNB Amended application Tue 01/19 1:35 PM
Amended application Related [+] filed by Tea Olive I, LLC. (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-] 4 Application to employ professional
trustee MNB US Trustee report in favor of employment Tue 01/19 5:43 PM
Notice of US Trustee report in favor of57 Amended application,58 Amended application,60 Amended application. (Wencil, Sarah)
Related: [-]