Sosa et al v. Brecqhou LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00217 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 10, 2021 4:27 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
David Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conrado Camacho Sosa
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
406 Broom St. Rest Inc.
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
|
Defendant
Brecqhou LLC
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
|
Defendant
Broom Street Hospitality
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
|
Defendant
Herm LLC
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
|
Defendant
Jethou LLC
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
|
Defendant
Lihou LLC
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
|
Defendant
Anthony Martignetti
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Martignetti
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
|
Defendant
St. Helier Tavern LLC
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 04/01 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Defendants BRECQHOU LLC, ST. HELIER TAVERN LLC, JETHOU LLC,LIHOU LLC, HERM LLC, 406 BROOM ST. REST INC., BROOM STREET HOSPITALITY,THOMAS MARTIGNETTI, and ANTHONY MARTIGNETTI are hereby dismissed from this action, without prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party. There has been no settlement and Plaintiffs intend to pursue their claims through valid arbitration agreements. So ordered. All claims in this case are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case., (Broom Street Hospitality, Herm LLC, Jethou LLC, Lihou LLC, Anthony Martignetti, Thomas Martignetti, St. Helier Tavern LLC, 406 Broom St. Rest Inc. and Brecqhou LLC terminated.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/1/21) (yv) |
|
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 03/31 8:45 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge J. Paul Oetken for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) case. (km) |
||
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 03/30 6:44 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) 406 Broom St. Rest Inc., Brecqhou LLC, Broom Street Hospitality, Herm LLC, Jethou LLC, Lihou LLC, Anthony Martignetti, Thomas Martignetti, St. Helier Tavern LLC. Document filed by Teresa Garcia, David Cruz, Conrado Camacho Sosa. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/19 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Seelig, Anne) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/11 3:46 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Martignetti..(jgo) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/21 2:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Broom Street Hospitality. (sj) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 01/20 10:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Broom Street Hospitality, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/12 2:15 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to St. Helier Tavern LLC..(pc) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/12 2:14 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 406 Broom St. Rest Inc...(pc) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/12 2:14 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Martignetti..(pc) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/12 2:13 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brecqhou LLC..(pc) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/12 2:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lihou LLC..(pc) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/12 2:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Herm LLC..(pc) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/12 2:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jethou LLC..(pc) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 01/12 9:56 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney C.K. Lee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teresa Garcia, David Cruz, Conrado Camacho Sosa.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 01/12 10:01 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 01/12 10:02 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 01/12 10:02 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 01/12 2:17 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney C.K. Lee to RE-FILE Document No. 9 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name does not match;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) |
||
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent to Sue
Mon 01/11 5:05 PM
CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Teresa Garcia..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Sue
Mon 01/11 5:04 PM
CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by David Cruz..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Sue
Mon 01/11 5:04 PM
CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
11 | 11
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/11 5:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Martignetti, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
10 | 10
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/11 5:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Martignetti, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/11 5:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Broom Street Hospitality, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/11 5:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 406 Broom St. Rest Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/11 5:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Herm LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/11 4:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lihou LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/11 4:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jethou LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/11 4:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to St. Helier Tavern LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/11 4:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brecqhou LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Cruz, Teresa Garcia, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 01/11 4:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Rider | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/11 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against 406 Broom St. Rest Inc., Brecqhou LLC, Broom Street Hospitality, Herm LLC, Jethou LLC, Lihou LLC, Anthony Martignetti, Thomas Martignetti, St. Helier Tavern LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23453191)Document filed by Teresa Garcia, David Cruz, Conrado Camacho Sosa..(Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |