New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:21-cv-00250
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 12, 2021 3:06 PM EST
All Defendants
AltasV Inc.
All Plaintiffs
InShot Inc.
Represented By
Shan Zhu
Hang & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/14/2021 11:59 PM EST
Thursday, January 14, 2021
6 6 misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Thu 01/14 10:08 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Zhu, Shan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/14 10:00 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zhu, Shan)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/14 9:54 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AtlasV Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by InShot Inc...(Zhu, Shan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/13 9:40 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Shan Zhu to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 01/13 9:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shan Zhu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: InShot Inc.; AltasV Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) Modified on 1/13/2021 (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 01/13 9:43 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 01/13 9:44 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 01/13 9:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/13 9:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Shan Zhu to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the 'as to' docket entry text contains a typographical error;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form Wed 01/13 10:20 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Shan Zhu to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/12 3:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AltasV Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by InShot Inc...(Zhu, Shan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/12 3:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zhu, Shan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/12 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT against AltasV Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23473156)Document filed by InShot Inc...(Zhu, Shan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A EU Trademark registration