New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:21-cv-00252
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause42:7604 Clean Air Act - Citizen suit to enforce Clean Air Act
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 12, 2021 4:11 PM EST
Defendant
United States Environmental Protection Agency
Defendant
Andrew R. Wheeler
Plaintiff
City Of New York
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Plaintiff
State Of Connecticut
Plaintiff
State Of Delaware,
Plaintiff
State Of New York
Represented By
Claiborne Ellis Walthall
Nys Office Of Attorney General Environmental Protection
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey


Docket last updated: 01/14/2021 11:59 PM EST
Thursday, January 14, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/14 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Nancy Lacedonia on behalf of State Of Connecticut..(Lacedonia, Jill)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 01/13 10:19 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 01/13 10:15 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 01/13 10:16 AM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 01/13 10:16 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/12 4:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew R. Wheeler; United States Environmental Protection Agency, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by City Of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State Of Connecticut, State Of Delaware,, State Of New York, State of New Jersey..(Walthall, Claiborne)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/12 4:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walthall, Claiborne)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/12 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23473648)Document filed by City Of New York, State Of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State Of Delaware,, State Of Connecticut, State of New Jersey..(Walthall, Claiborne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice Letter