Angeles v. Funimation Global Group, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Gardephe |
Referred: | Sarah L Cave |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00299 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 13, 2021 4:57 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
Jenisa Angeles
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Funimation Global Group, LLC
Terminated: 05/17/2021
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 05/17 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IT IS HEREBY AGREED TO by the Plaintiff and Plaintiff's attorney, and the Defendant, Funimation Global Group, LLC that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, that the above entitled action against Defendant, Funimation Global Group, LLC shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice and on the merits, without costs, or disbursements, or attorney's fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and that the dismissal with prejudice may be entered in the above entitled action pursuant hereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/17/2021) Funimation Global Group, LLC terminated. (ks) |
|
Thursday, May 13, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 05/13 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Funimation Global Group, LLC. Document filed by Jenisa Angeles. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rozenberg, Mark) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 03/12 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/17 2:25 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Funimation Global Group, LLC served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 01/15 12:24 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/15/2021) (jca) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/14 9:17 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Funimation Global Group, LLC..(gp) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 01/14 9:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 01/14 9:13 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 01/14 9:13 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp) |
||
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 01/13 3:15 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Funimation Global Group, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 01/13 3:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/13 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Funimation Global Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23494582)Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark) |