Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Laurie J Michelson
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:21-cv-10108
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2021
Terminated:Jun 14, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 13, 2021 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER
Represented By
Maxwell J. Goss
Fishman Stewart PLLC
contact info
Joshua Geller
Greenberg Glusker
contact info
Aaron Joseph Moss
Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman & Machtinger LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SAHI COSMETICS L.L.C
Represented By
Jehan G. Crump-Gibson
C And G Solutions PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, June 14, 2021
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/14 8:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Crump-Gibson, Jehan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
14 14 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation and Order Tue 05/11 8:57 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Response to11 MOTION to Dismiss. ( Response due by 6/10/2021 ) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/22 10:57 AM
ORDER Regarding Determination of11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 04/19 7:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER. (Moss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration of Joshua Geller in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Joshua Geller in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 4 Declaration of JoAnna Blythe in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 5 Notice of Filing Exhibits in the Traditional Manner,
Att: 6 Index of Exhibits in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
10 10 notice Appearance Mon 04/19 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Geller on behalf of REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER. (Geller, Joshua)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance Mon 04/19 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Joseph Moss on behalf of REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER. (Moss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 04/19 3:19 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER (Moss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 04/19 8:38 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: GRANTING Defendant's7 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits in the Traditional Manner. Counsel is directed to provide a copy of the exhibit to the Clerk's Office with the proper notice of filing and a working copy to Judge's chambers. Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
7 7 motion Leave to File Thu 04/15 11:54 AM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits in the Traditional Manner by REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER. (Goss, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Thu 04/15 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maxwell J. Goss on behalf of REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER. (Goss, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 02/16 3:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER waiver sent on 1/18/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Crump-Gibson, Jehan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
4 4 misccs Misc. Case - Initiating Document, Other Fri 01/15 3:02 PM
Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs , Receipt No: AMIEDC-8279376 - Fee: 49 dollars. (Crump-Gibson, Jehan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 01/15 2:54 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Crump-Gibson, Jehan)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 01/15 9:09 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *REA.DEEMING BEAUTY, INC. D/B/A BEAUTYBLENDER* (SOso)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 01/15 9:12 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SOso)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 01/14 6:51 PM
COMPLAINT filed by SAHI COSMETICS L.L.C against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8277183 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Crump-Gibson, Jehan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit