Mey v. Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Eleanor L Ross |
Referred: | Russell G Vineyard |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01846 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2014 |
Re-opened: | Jan 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 17, 2014 10:42 AM EST |
Defendant
All American Auto Protection, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dealer Services Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Moxy Solution, LLC
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP Suite 3100 Promenade 1230 Peachtree St NE
Atlanta, GA 30309 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Mey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
175 | 175
order
Judgment
Wed 06/15 4:15 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, as to the above-specified classes of persons, Plaintiff Diana Mey (the "Class Representative"), and Interstate and the Released Parties, on the terms and conditions of the Class Action Settlement and Release (the "Settlement Agreement") approved by the Court's June 7, 2016, Final Approval Order. 1. The Court, for purposes of this Final Judgment, adopts the terms and definitions set forth in the Settlement Agreement incorporated into the Final Approval Order. 2. All Released Claims of the Releasing Parties are hereby released as against Defendants and all other Released Parties, as defined in the Settlement Agreement. 3. The claims of the Class Representative and the Settlement Classes are dismissed on the merits and with prejudice in accordance with the Court's Final Approval Order. 4. The Parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, except as otherwise set forth in the Final Approval Order. 5. This document constitutes a final judgment and separate document for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). 6. The Court finds, pursuant to Rule 54(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, that this Final Judgment should be entered and that there is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Final Judgment as to Plaintiffs and Defendants. Accordingly, the Clerk is hereby directed to enter Judgment forthwith. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/15/16. --Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--(kxw) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 06/15 4:17 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (kxw) |
||
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
174 | 174
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 06/14 6:39 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Final Judgment re:173 Order. (Paronich, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
173 | 173
order
Order
Wed 06/08 10:02 AM
FINAL APPROVAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/7/16. (kxw) |