SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC. et al v. SAFETH, LTD. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Beryl A Howell |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00161 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 17, 2021 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
CYNTHIA LATHUS
|
|
Defendant
JOEY LATHUS
|
|
Defendant
SAFETH, LTD.
|
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL DABEK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
16
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 05/12 4:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding plaintiffs'35 Motion for Default Judgment and the entry, with the parties' consent, of a permanent injunction against defendants Joey Lathus and Cynthia Lathus. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 12, 2021. (lcbah1) |
|
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 05/12 4:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART plaintiffs'35 Motion for Default Judgment and ENTERING, with the parties' consent, a PERMANENT INJUNCTION against defendants Joey Lathus and Cynthia Lathus. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 12, 2021. (lcbah1) |
|
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 04/26 10:53 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JOEY LATHUS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 26, 2021. (zeg) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 04/26 10:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) NOTIFYING the parties that ten emails were sent to Chambers between Thursday, April 15, 2021 and Sunday, April 25, 2021, by defendant Joey Lathus, many of which emails were also sent to plaintiffs' counsel, and DIRECTING that the emails be docketed under seal. The emails restate information about plaintiff Daniel Dabek and his connection to Dascoin, already provided by defendant Joey Lathus to the Court in prior emails that the Court directed be filed on the docket under seal, see Min. Orders (Jan. 25, 2021 and Mar. 26, 2021);15 Sealed Document;30 Sealed Document. Because the new emails contain statements similar to those that plaintiffs in the instant lawsuit allege are defamatory, they will be docketed under seal and be accessible only to the parties, not the public. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 26, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 04/19 3:33 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JOEY LATHUS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 19, 2021.(zeg) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 04/19 12:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) NOTIFYING the parties that an email was sent to both Chambers and plaintiffs' counsel on Thursday, April 8, 2021, and DIRECTING that the email be docketed under seal, such that it will be accessible only to the parties, not the public. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 19, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
order
.Order
Mon 04/12 5:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING defendants TO SHOW CAUSE, by April 23, 2021, why plaintiff's35 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Safeth Ltd. should not be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 12, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/12 5:46 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 4/23/2021. (ztg) |
||
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 04/09 8:21 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Safeth Ltd. by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC..(Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/09 8:15 PM
NOTICE - Plaintiffs' Submission in Favor of the Preliminary Injunction Being Converted to a Permanent Injunction by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC.(Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
order
Fox/Neal Order
Fri 03/26 5:44 PM
ORDER ADVISING defendants to respond to the Court's March 26, 2021 Minute Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 26, 2021. (lcbah1) |
|
32 | 32
41
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 03/26 12:18 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION concerning plaintiffs'4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 26, 2021. (lcbah1) |
|
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for TRO
Fri 03/26 12:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART plaintiffs'4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 26, 2021. (lcbah1) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 03/26 11:49 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CYNTHIA LATHUS, JOEY LATHUS, SAFETH, LTD.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" Signed by CHIEF JUDGE Beryl A. Howell, U.S.D.J ON 03/26/2021(zjf) |
|
order
.Order
Fri 03/26 11:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) NOTIFYING the parties that two emails were sent to Chambers between Saturday, March 6, 2021 and Wednesday, March 10, 2021, by defendant Joey Lathus, and DIRECTING that both emails be docketed under seal. The emails restate information about defendant Daniel Dabek and his connection to Dascoin, already provided by defendant Joey Lathus to the Court in prior emails that the Court directed be filed on the docket under seal, see Min. Order (Jan. 25, 2021);15 Sealed Document. Because the new emails contain statements similar to those that plaintiffs in the instant lawsuit allege are defamatory, they will be docketed under seal and be accessible only to the parties, not the public. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 26, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
order
.Order
Fri 03/26 5:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to submit, by April 9, 2021, their views on whether the preliminary injunction in this case may be converted into a permanent injunction; if not, what further steps, if any, are necessary before this case may proceed to final resolution; and what modifications, if any, would need to be made to the preliminary injunction before entry of a permanent injunction in order to ensure that any permanent injunction is "properly tailored" and not "overly broad," Tory v. Cochran , 544 U.S. 734, 737-38 (2005). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 26, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 03/11 1:45 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SAFETH, LTD. (eg) |
|
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 03/10 12:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) VACATING the hearing on plaintiffs'4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, currently scheduled for March 12, 2021, at 2:00 PM. This Court previously, on January 26, 2021, conducted a hearing on plaintiffs'4 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, at which hearing defendants participated. See Min. Entry (Jan. 26, 2021). Given that the factual and legal issues implicated by plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order are identical to those implicated by their Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, the Court's January 26, 2021 hearing afforded defendants the opportunity to be heard on both of plaintiffs' motions for injunctive relief, and no new factual developments or legal arguments have been advanced that would warrant holding a second, duplicative hearing. In fact, despite the Court's admonitions to defendants that defendant Safeth, Ltd., as a limited company, "must be represented by counsel in this matter," Min. Order (Jan. 25, 2021); see also Min. Order (Feb. 3, 2021);22 Hr'g Tr. at 4:24-5:15 (Jan. 26, 2021), no counsel has entered an appearance for corporate defendant Safeth, Ltd., more than seven weeks after the initiation of the instant lawsuit, prompting plaintiffs to file an26 Affidavit for Default against defendant Safeth, Ltd. In addition, defendants have not filed on the docket any timely opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. In light of these circumstances, the Court finds that the parties will not be prejudiced by resolving plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on the papers, without conducting a second hearing, see LCvR 65.1(d); Min. Order (Feb. 3, 2021) (notifying the parties that the March 12, 2021 hearing "may be cancelled if the Court determines that the briefing is sufficient for resolution of disputed issues"), and accordingly, the March 12, 2021 hearing is vacated. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 10, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Saturday, March 06, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/09 6:59 AM
Supplemental DECLARATION by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC. re4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC., DANIEL DABEK. (eg) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Sat 03/06 3:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs'27 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration of Daniel Dabek and DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to file the [27-1] Supplemental Declaration of Daniel Dabek on the docket. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 6, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 03/05 1:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration of Daniel Dabek by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC..(Evans, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Supplemental Declaration of Daniel Dabek, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
misc
Affidavit for Default
Tue 02/23 11:27 AM
AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC.. (Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/04 8:55 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' opposition to plaintiffs'4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction due by 2/17/2021; plaintiffs' reply due by 3/5/2021; Motion Hearing scheduled for 3/12/2021, at 2:00 PM via videoconference before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (ztg) |
||
notice
Notice of QC
Thu 02/04 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re25 Status Report; emailed to chwhalen@mwe.com, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. Attorney signature must match login/password in future fillings. (zeg, ) |
||
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 02/03 5:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of plaintiffs'25 Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control further proceedings in this case: (1) by February 17, 2021, defendants shall file any opposition to plaintiff's4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; (2) by March 5, 2021, plaintiffs shall file any reply in support of their Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; (3) on March 12, 2021, at 2:00 PM, if necessary, the parties shall appear via videoconference for a hearing on plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, which hearing may be cancelled if the Court determines that the briefing is sufficient for resolution of disputed issues; EXTENDING the20 Amended Temporary Restraining Order, which would otherwise lapse on February 10, 2021, 14 days from the date of its issuance, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2); Granny Goose Foods, Inc. v. Bhd. of Teamsters and Auto Truck Drivers Local No. 70 , 415 U.S. 413, 431 (1974), until plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is resolved, as indicated in the temporary restraining order, see Amended Temporary Restraining Order at 2, having determined that there is good cause for an extension, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2), in light of the clarity of the record that plaintiffs own the Safex trademark; DIRECTING plaintiffs to communicate with defendants to cure the alleged ongoing trademark infringement described in the Status Report at 2-4 and the [25-1] Declaration of Joseph B. Evans, before seeking the assistance of the Court, since defendants have indicated their intention to cease any alleged infringement activity, see 24 Letter at 1;23 Sealed Document at 1; CAUTIONING defendant Safeth, Ltd., again, that, as a limited company, it must be represented by counsel in this matter, see Greater Se. Cmty. Hosp. Found. v. Potter , 586 F.3d 1, 4 (D.C. Cir. 2009) ("It has been the law for the better part of two centuries... that a corporation may appear in the federal courts only through licensed counsel." (omission in original) (quoting Rowland v. Cal. Men's Colony , 506 U.S. 194, 201-02 (1993))), and is subject to entry of default if no counsel registers an appearance; and further DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of this Minute Order on defendants by email at the email addresses joetattooski@gmail.com and admin@safeth.io. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 3, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
5
pgs
misc
Status Report
Tue 02/02 11:56 PM
STATUS REPORT by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC..(Whalen, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration Declaration of Joseph B. Evans, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit R | ||
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
.Order
Mon 02/01 1:18 PM
DOCUMENT filed by CYNTHIA LATHUS, JOEY LATHUS, SAFETH, LTD.. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 1, 2021. (lcbah1) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 02/01 1:01 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CYNTHIA LATHUS, JOEY LATHUS, SAFETH, LTD.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 02/01/2021.(zeg) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 02/01 10:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) NOTIFYING the parties that defendants have submitted two letters, via email, first, informing the Court of the steps they have taken to comply with the20 Amended Temporary Restraining Order, as ordered, see Amended Temporary Restraining Order at 2; and, second, informing the Court of certain personal information; and DIRECTING that both emails be docketed, with the second email docketed under seal so as not to be accessible to the public and only to the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 1, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Transcript
Thu 01/28 5:51 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell, held on 1 26-2021 Page Numbers: 1- 77. Date of Issuance: 1 28-2021 Court Reporter: Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced abov e. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2021.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/28 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Mlaver on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mlaver, David) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
.Order
Wed 01/27 9:58 AM
AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 27, 2021. (lcbah1) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/27 9:24 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Order of the Court due by 2/2/2021; joint proposed briefing schedule due by 2/2/2021. (ztg) |
||
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
.Order
Tue 01/26 10:35 PM
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 26, 2021. (lcbah1) |
|
minutes
Motion Hearing
Tue 01/26 4:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell: Motion Hearing held via videoconference on 1/26/2021 re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC., DANIEL DABEK. Oral ruling granting in part and denying in part. Written order to be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Saint-Loth.) (ztg) |
||
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
misc
Errata
Mon 01/25 10:02 PM
ERRATA re1 and4 (ECF No. 1-1) and (ECF No. 4-17) by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC..(Evans, Joseph) Modified to add linkson 1/26/2021 (znmw). |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit P | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/25 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Whalen on behalf of DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC. (Whalen, Christopher) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/25 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph B. Evans on behalf of DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC. (Evans, Joseph) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 01/25 12:29 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SAFETH, LTD.. re Order. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zeg) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
notice
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Mon 01/25 12:19 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 01/25 12:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) NOTIFYING the parties that nine emails were sent to Chambers between Wednesday, January 20, 2021 and Monday, January 25, 2021, all of which appear to be from a named defendant, one of which may have been sent to plaintiffs' counsel, as it apparently forwards a response from a named defendant to plaintiffs' counsel, and many of which include attachments; and that the emails, although not the emails' attachments, have been forwarded to the Case Administrator for docketing as sealed documents not accessible to the public; CAUTIONING all defendants that contacting Chambers directly, except in limited circumstances that do not apply here, violates the Standing Order, see 10 Standing Order at 1, and continued violation of this Order may be subject to a finding of contempt and other penalties; and CAUTIONING defendant Safeth, Ltd. that, as a limited company, it must be represented by counsel in this matter, see Greater Se. Cmty. Hosp. Found. v. Potter , 586 F.3d 1, 4 (D.C. Cir. 2009) ("It has been the law for the better part of two centuries... that a corporation may appear in the federal courts only through licensed counsel." (omission in original) (quoting Rowland v. Cal. Mens Colony , 506 U.S. 194, 201-02 (1993))), and is subject to entry of default if no counsel registers an appearance. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 25, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 01/22 8:18 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing scheduled for 1/26/2021, at 2:00 PM via videoconference before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (ztg) |
||
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Mon 01/25 9:27 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CYNTHIA LATHUS served on 1/19/2020, answer due 2/9/2020; JOEY LATHUS served on 1/19/2020, answer due 2/9/2020; SAFETH, LTD. served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (View Docket Entry12 to view document). (eg) |
|
12 | 12
5
pgs
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/21 1:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC. .(Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
misc
Status Report
Thu 01/21 12:25 PM
STATUS REPORT by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC.. (Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 01/21 11:07 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Order of the Court due by noon on 1/21/2021. (ztg) |
||
order
.Order
Thu 01/21 5:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of plaintiffs'11 Status Report, the parties to appear via videoconference at 2:00 p.m. on January 26, 2021 for a hearing on plaintiffs'4 Application for a Temporary Restraining Order before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. Connection details will be provided to counsel by the deputy clerk. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 21, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
6
pgs
order
Standing Order
Wed 01/20 9:30 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 20, 2021. (lcbah1) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
6
pgs
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 01/19 4:20 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CYNTHIA LATHUS, JOEY LATHUS, SAFETH, LTD.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
misc
Errata
Tue 01/19 3:07 PM
ERRATA by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC. re1 Complaint, filed by SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC., DANIEL DABEK.(Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
Att: 1 Corrected Complaint | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/19 11:59 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Whalen, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8093398. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC..(Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/19 11:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph B. Evans, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8093360. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC..(Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/19 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Llewelyn Engel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
notice
Notice of QC- New Case
Tue 01/19 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to lengel@mwe.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata. (adh, ) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 01/19 4:14 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/19 6:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs'6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph B. Evans. Mr. Evans may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 19, 20 21. (lcbah1) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/19 6:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs'7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Whalen. Mr. Whalen may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiffs in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 1 9, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
order
.Order
Tue 01/19 6:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of plaintiffs'4 Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, plaintiffs to confer with opposing counsel and submit, by noon on January 21, 2021, a status report that proposes two mutually acceptable dates and times for a videoconference hearing on plaintiffs' application for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 19, 2021. (lcbah1) |
||
Monday, January 18, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
42
pgs
motion
Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order
Mon 01/18 6:39 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC, SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC.(Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
Att: 1 24 pgs Declaration of Daniel Dakek, | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Dabek Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Dabek Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Dabek Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Dabek Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Dabek Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Dabek Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Dabek Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Dabek Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Dabek Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Dabek Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Dabek Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Dabek Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Dabek Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Dabek Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 16 Dabek Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 17 Dabek Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 18 4 pgs Dabek Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 19 Dabek Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 20 5 pgs Dabek Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 21 Dabek Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 22 2 pgs Dabek Exhibit U, | ||
Att: 23 Dabek Exhibit V, | ||
Att: 24 Dabek Exhibit W, | ||
Att: 25 Dabek Exhibit X, | ||
Att: 26 Dabek Exhibit Y, | ||
Att: 27 Dakek Exhibit Z, | ||
Att: 28 Dabek Exhibit AA, | ||
Att: 29 Dabek Exhibit BB, | ||
Att: 30 Dabek Exhibit CC, | ||
Att: 31 Dabek Exhibit DD, | ||
Att: 32 Dabek Exhibit EE, | ||
Att: 33 Dabek Exhibit FF, | ||
Att: 34 2 pgs Dabek Exhibit GG, | ||
Att: 35 Dabek Exhibit HH, | ||
Att: 36 Text of Proposed Order for Permanent Injunction, | ||
Att: 37 Text of Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order, | ||
Att: 38 Certificate Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 65.1 | ||
3 | 3
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 01/18 6:13 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC. (Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 01/18 6:12 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC (Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
1 | 1
40
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/18 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8090317) filed by SAFEX FOUNDATION, INC., DANIEL DABEK, SAFE EXCHANGE FOUNDATION, LLC.(Engel, Llewelyn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Summons to Cynthia Lathus, | ||
Att: 8 Summons to Joseph Lathus, | ||
Att: 9 Summons to Safeth, Ltd. |