USA v. Chen
Massachusetts District Court | |
Case #: | 1:21-cr-10018 |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 21, 2021 2:28 AM EST |
Defendant
Gang Chen (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 06 2021
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS denying 23 Motion for Sanctions as to Gang Chen (1). (Russo, Noreen) |
Docket last updated: 01/20/2022 12:04 PM EST |
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Gang Chen; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
2 | 2 MOTION to Seal Case as to Gang Chen by USA. (Russo, Noreen) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
3 | 3 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Gang Chen (1) (Russo, Noreen) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
4 | 4 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Gang Chen (1).(Russo, Noreen) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 JS45 | ||
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
Arrest of Gang Chen (Russo, Noreen) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | ||
6 | 6 MOTION to Unseal Case as to Gang Chen by USA. (Russo, Noreen) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
7 | 7 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion to Unseal Case as to Gang Chen (1) (Russo, Noreen) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
8 | 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Gang Chen. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . Initial Appearance set for 1/14/2021 at 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert A. Fisher appearing for Gang Chen. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Fisher, Robert) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
10 | 10 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Remote Initial Appearance by videoconference as to Gang Chen held on 1/14/2021. The court informs the def't of the reason the court is proceeding by videoconference. The def't waives his right to appear in person. The court informs the def't of the charges against him and his rights. Def't has retained counsel. The gov't states the maximum penalties and agrees to the defendant's release on conditions. Defense counsel to explore the need for a preliminary hearing with his client and inform the clerk if one is requested. The gov't requests a million dollar bond secured by real property but the court would prefer not to secure the bond with real estate. Parties to confer about the security that can be offered for the bond. The court sets conditions of release. Def't released. (Attorneys present: Siegmann, Casey, Kistner, Fisher. USPO Souza )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com. (Russo, Noreen) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
11 | 11 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Gang Chen. (Russo, Noreen) [1:21-mj-01011-DLC] | |
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
12 | 12 INDICTMENT as to Gang Chen (1) count(s) 1-2, 3, 4.(DaSilva, Carolina) | |
Att: 1 JS45 |