Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan D Albright |
Case #: | 6:21-cv-00067 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 21, 2021 3:59 AM CDT |
Defendant
Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
misc
Acknowledgment of District Case Transfer
Thu 08/19 9:32 AM
Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in California Northern District District as case number 3:21-cv-06313. (ir) |
||
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Change Venue
Mon 08/16 2:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING23 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) |
|
utility
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Mon 08/16 2:46 PM
Case transferred to Northern District of California. (ir) |
||
Thursday, July 29, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 07/29 4:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC, re23 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue Based on the First-to-File Rule filed by Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Defendant Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Defendant Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Plaintiff's Response in Non-Opposition to the Relief Requested in Defs' Motion to Transfer (Breedlove, Scott) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Change Venue
Thu 07/29 11:02 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue Based on the First-to-File Rule by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc..(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. 1 - N.D. Cal. 20-cv-08205 dckt 000001_000 filed 2020-11-20, | ||
Att: 2 Ex. 2 - N.D. Cal. 20-cv-08205 dckt 000022_000 filed 2021-01-27, | ||
Att: 3 Ex. 3 - N.D. Cal. 20-cv-08205 dckt 000055_000 filed 2021-06-24, | ||
Att: 4 Ex. 4 - N.D. Cal. 20-cv-08205 dckt 000057_000 filed 2021-07-08, | ||
Att: 5 Ex. 5 - Docket Navigator (as of 7.28), | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 28, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Lift Stay
Wed 07/28 12:43 PM
Text Order GRANTING22 Motion to Lift Stay entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Motion to Lift Stay for the Limited Purpose of Filing and Resolving an Unopposed Motion to Transfer. After consideration of same, the Court finds that said Joint Motion should be GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants shall file their opening Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California within fourteen (14) days of the Court entering this Order and Plaintiff may respond to the Motion to Transfer pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(d)(2). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
||
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Lift Stay
Thu 07/08 11:03 AM
Joint MOTION to Lift Stay for the Limited Purpose of Filing and Resolving an Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc..(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 29, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice
Tue 06/29 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Joint Statement by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Ex A - [Trenchant (NDCA)] Order Denying Motion to Dismiss | ||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
5
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/17 5:23 PM
|
|
19 | 19
5
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/17 3:13 PM
|
|
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Supplement to
Mon 04/12 5:52 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint Exhibits A-E by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC.(Breedlove, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay Case
Fri 03/19 3:56 PM
ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Stay Case. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Case No. 6:21-CV-00067-ADA is stayed until resolution of the Motion to Dismiss in Case No. 3:20-cv-08205-VC, filed in the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stay Case
Thu 03/18 12:01 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc..(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. 1 - N.D. Cal. 20-cv-08205 Dkt 1_2020-11-20, | ||
Att: 2 Ex. 2 - N.D. Cal. 20-cv-08205 Dkt 22_2021-01-27, | ||
Att: 3 Ex. 3 - N.D. Cal. 20-cv-08205 Dkt 25_2021-02-05, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 02/16 3:50 PM
Text Order GRANTING14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. have up to and including Monday, April 19, 2021 to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Wed 02/17 11:11 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC answer due 4/19/2021; Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 4/19/2021; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. answer due 4/19/2021; Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. answer due 4/19/2021. (bw) |
||
Friday, February 12, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/25 11:18 AM
Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 02/05 1:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc..(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 02/05 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/25 4:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (lad) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/25 4:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (lad) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/25 4:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC. (lad) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/25 4:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (lad) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/25 4:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Breedlove, Scott) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/25 4:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. National Registered Agents, Inc. c/o Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. (Breedlove, Scott) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/25 4:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. CT Corporation System c/o Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC (Breedlove, Scott) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/25 4:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Breedlove, Scott) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Fri 01/22 8:07 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Breedlove, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 01/22 8:06 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC. (Breedlove, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
45
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/22 7:57 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14407322), filed by Trenchant Blade Technologies LLC.(Breedlove, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/25 9:32 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) |
||
Thursday, November 19, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/25 9:29 AM
Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) |