Shen Yi, LLC v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas N Frazier |
Referred: | Nicholas P Mizell |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00066 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2021 |
Case in other court: | In the Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit, 2020-CA-000336 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 25, 2021 6:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lee Segal
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Segal & Schuh Law Group, P.L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shen Yi, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
58 | 58
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge / Juror Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement
Fri 01/28 2:49 PM
ORDER denying 32 Motion for Sanctions and Attorney's Fees; finding as moot 33 Request for Judicial Notice; denying as moot 34 Motion to Strike Motion for Sanctions; and finding as moot 37 Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 1/28/2022. (brh) |