Shiheiber v. Hernandez et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00609 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 21, 2021 2:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Officer Hernandez Badge #4039
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of San Francisco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ibrahim Nimer Shiheiber
9836 Springfield Street
Oakland, CA 94603 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
SFPD
Terminated: 04/30/2021
San Francisco Police Department c/o SFPD Legal 853 Bryant Street Suite 575
San Francisco, CA 94103 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
125 | 125
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 04/12 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by David S. Ratner (Ratner, David) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 04/12 2:43 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Attorney Shelley A. Molineaux needs to update the ECF account for the new address to be in effect. Re:125 Notice of Change of Address filed by Ibrahim Nimer Shiheiber. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
124 | 124
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 04/08 8:56 AM
Order. Signed 4/8/2024 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 123 Stipulation to Continue Further Case Mgmt Conference.(klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
oth_evt
~Util - Teleconference Zoom Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/08 8:58 AM
See Order124 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Case Management Conference re-set for 6/14/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (klh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
123 | 123
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 04/05 8:21 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re122 Order on Stipulation, TO CONTINUE THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Brett Hernandez. (Mills, Steven) |