United States of America v. Space Exploration Technologies Corp.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:21-mc-00043 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2021 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 30, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 06/30 3:48 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the Order Accepting Findings and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge29 , IT IS ADJUDGED that that the government's application for enforcement of its administrative subpoena is GRANTED. Respondent SpaceX is ORDERED to comply in full with the subpoena within 21 days. (lom) |
|
29 | 29
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
Wed 06/30 3:23 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE24 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS ORDERED that the Application for an order compelling compliance with the government's subpoena is GRANTED and judgment is entered in the government's favor. (lom) |
|
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
respoth
Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendation
Mon 04/26 12:07 PM
REPLY TO OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued)24 filed by Applicant United States of America. (Sandoval, Lisa) |
|
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Mon 04/12 7:40 PM
OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued)24 filed by Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp..(Connolly, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
transcript
-Transcript
Tue 03/30 10:29 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/18/21. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2021. (ha) |
|
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Tue 03/30 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/18/21 re Transcript25 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) |
||
Monday, March 29, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Mon 03/29 10:17 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (vm) |
|
23 | 23
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Mon 03/29 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Objections to R&R due by April 12, 2021. (vm) |
|
Att: 1 Report and Recommendation | ||
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
transcript
-Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Tue 03/23 5:26 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jessica H. Ro at jro@akingump.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Ro, Jessica) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form
Fri 03/19 11:47 AM
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conducted another video hearing with the parties this week regarding the fully-briefed application. No further proceedings will be scheduled nor will additional briefing be received. (See Minute Order for further details) Court Recorder: ZoomGov 3/18/2021. (vm) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 03/12 12:34 PM
REPLY to Respondent's Opposition filed by Petitioner United States of America.(Sandoval, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
21
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Fri 02/26 7:47 PM
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. Re: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1(Ro, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher Cardaci in Support of Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Application for Order to Comply with Administrative Subpoena, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Cardaci Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Cardaci Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Cardaci Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Cardaci Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Cardaci Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 02/08 2:21 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
17 | 17
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 02/08 11:20 AM
ORDER RE SCHEDULING held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner: 1. The Court conducted a video hearing with the parties today. Based on that discussion, here's the scheduled for the subpoena enforcement action: a. SpaceX's responsive submission (NTE 25 pages plus relevant exhibits/attachments/declarations) due by Friday, February 26. b. The government's optional reply (same limits) due by Friday, March 12. c. Video hearing tentatively set for Thursday, March 18, at 10 a.m. PT. 2. The parties may jointly contact t he Clerk at the chambers' e-mail address to request revisions to the schedule or to arrange additional meetings with Judge Wilner. Court Reporter: Zoom. (es) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/05 4:14 PM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph DiPiero to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SpaceX, designating Jessica H. Ro as local counsel11 . (gk) |
|
15 | 15
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/05 4:11 PM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney James Tysse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SpaceX, designating Jessica H. Ro as local counsel10 . (gk) |
|
14 | 14
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/05 4:06 PM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Charles F. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SpaceX, designating Jessica H. Ro as local counsel9 . (gk) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Fri 02/05 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph DiPiero to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30408693)11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): DC admission not listed. (Thrasher, Lupe) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Fri 02/05 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles F. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30407696)9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (Thrasher, Lupe) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 02/04 4:41 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph DiPiero to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30408693) filed by defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Ro, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 02/04 4:32 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Tysse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30408550) filed by defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Ro, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 02/04 4:24 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles F. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30407696) filed by defendant Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Ro, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Appearance
Thu 02/04 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jessica H. Ro on behalf of Respondent Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (Attorney Jessica H. Ro added to party Space Exploration Technologies Corp.(pty:res))(Ro, Jessica) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 02/01 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner United States of America, Application for Order to Comply with Administrative Subpoena and Related Documents by E-mail served on February 1,2021. (Jhaveri, Sejal) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 02/01 8:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner United States of America, Application for Order to Comply with Administrative Subpoena and Related Documents served on January 29, 2021. (Jhaveri, Sejal) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 02/01 9:05 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The matter will be set for a video conference on Monday, February 8, at 10 a.m. PT. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 01/29 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) |
|
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 01/29 2:08 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court is in receipt of Petitioner United States of America's Application for an Order to Comply with Administrative Subpoena1 . The Petition is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Wilner for a report and recommendation. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
||
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 01/28 12:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Sandoval, Lisa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 01/28 12:06 PM
APPLICATION For Order to Comply With Administrative Subpoena No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Attorney Lisa Renee Sandoval added to party United States of America(pty:pet))(Sandoval, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order |