Pomije v. DigitalTown, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-32155
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-32155
Minnesota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Katherine A Constantine |
Case #: | 3:21-ap-03003 |
Nature of Suit | 65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
DigitalTown, Inc.
202 N Cedar St Suite 1
Owatonna, MN 55060 |
|
Plaintiff
Richard A. Pomije
Olson Law Office 2605 East Cliff Road
Burnsville, MN 55337 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
67 | 67
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Wed 12/15 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/15/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 13, 2021 | ||
66 | 66
order
MNB Order (Generic)
Mon 12/13 1:27 PM
Order Approving Settlement (Laura MNB) |
|
utility
MNB Disposition of adversary
Mon 12/13 3:04 PM
Disposition of adversary 3:21-ap-3003. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Alicia MNBS) |
||
court
MNB Close adversary case
Mon 12/13 3:09 PM
Adversary case 3:21-ap-3003 closed (Alicia MNBS) |